EP1361399 - Room heating and ventilating ceiling device having a rotational blowing element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2005 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.08.2005 [2005/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B.V.S. d.o.o. Ulica pohorskega bataljona 14 2000 Maribor / SI | [2003/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vidakovic, Rudolf Ulica Jelencevih 64 2341 Pekre / SI | [2003/46] | Representative(s) | Kloiber, Thomas Vonnemann Kloiber & Kollegen Sckellstrasse 6 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | Kloiber, Thomas, Dr. Dipl.-Phys Vonnemann Kloiber & Kollegen Belgradstrasse 1 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02010158.0 | 08.05.2002 | [2003/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1361399 | Date: | 12.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F24F1/00, F24F13/06 | [2003/46] | CPC: |
F24F1/0011 (EP);
F24F1/0047 (EP);
F24F13/06 (EP);
F24F11/79 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE [2004/32] |
Former [2003/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Deckenanlage zur Raumbeheizung und Raumbelüftung mit Rotationsausblaselement | [2003/46] | English: | Room heating and ventilating ceiling device having a rotational blowing element | [2003/46] | French: | Dispositif de plafond pour le chauffage et la ventilation d'un local avec élément de soufflage rotatif | [2003/46] | Examination procedure | 17.02.2004 | Examination requested [2004/16] | 13.05.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.08.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 19.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.06.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.06.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1805475 (BRANDI DIPL ING OTTO HEINZ); | [X]SI9800278 (S D O O B V [SI]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X] - BEWA, "Rotierende Heizgeräte", PLANUNGSHEFT FÜR GERÄTEAUSWAHL INSTALLATION UND AUSSCHREIBUNG, Austria, (198901), XP002215220 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * |