EP1260866 - Additive composition for rinse water and method for surface treatment of lithographic printing plates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.01.2011 [2011/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kodak Graphic Communications GmbH An der Bahn 80 37520 Osterode/Harz / DE | [2007/48] |
Former [2004/21] | For all designated states Kodak Polychrome Graphics GmbH An der Bahn 80 37520 Osterode/Harz / DE | ||
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states Kodak Polychrome Graphics Company Ltd. 401 Merritt 7 Norwalk, Connecticut 06851 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fiebag, Ulrich Rosenweg 16 31688 Nienstädt / DE | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/48] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02010210.9 | 15.05.2002 | [2002/48] | Priority number, date | US20010861126 | 18.05.2001 Original published format: US 861126 | [2002/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1260866 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1260866 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/32, B41N3/08, B41N3/00 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
G03F7/322 (EP,US);
B41N3/006 (EP,US);
G03F7/3092 (EP,US);
G03F7/32 (EP,US);
G03F7/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/48] | G03F7/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/48] | Title | German: | Zusatzzusammensetzung für Spülwasser und Verfahren zur Oberflächenbehandlung von Flachdruckplatten | [2002/48] | English: | Additive composition for rinse water and method for surface treatment of lithographic printing plates | [2002/48] | French: | Composition additive pour de l'eau de rinçage et méthode pour le traitement de surfaces de plaques d'impression planographique | [2002/48] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/34] | 23.11.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2004 | 31.05.2005 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.09.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS58193194 ; | [X]JPS61230990 ; | [X]EP0336673 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-9 * page 10 * * page 4, line 53 - page 5, line 33 *; | [X]EP0411883 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1 * example 3 *; | [A]EP0528395 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-22 * page 16, line 16 - line 19 *; | [X]US5736256 (FROMSON HOWARD A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7 * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 2; example - *; | [A]US5994031 (HIRAI YOKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-22* column 2, line 40 - line 42 *; | [A]EP1081554 (KODAK POLYCHROME GRAPHICS CO [US]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document * * paragraph [0064] *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1983, no. 51, Database accession no. 1983-847251, XP002256888 & JPS58193194 A 19831110 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [X] 1,3,5,9,10 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1986, no. 48, Database accession no. 1986-314201, XP002256889 & JPS61230990 A 19861015 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * |