EP1256718 - Control valve for variable displacement compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2006 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.04.2006 [2006/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8671 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken 448-8671 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukasaku, Hiroshi, c/oK.K. Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Hayashi, Hirohito, c/oK.K. Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Iwata, Kitaru, c/oK.K. Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 04 /
Umemura, Satoshi, c/oK.K. Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 05 /
Matsubara, Ryo, c/oK.K. Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 06 /
Adaniya, Taku, c/oK.K. Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [2002/46] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/46] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02010341.2 | 07.05.2002 | [2002/46] | Priority number, date | JP20010140244 | 10.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001140244 | [2002/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1256718 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1256718 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | [2004/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1256718 | Date: | 27.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F04B27/18 | [2002/46] | CPC: |
F04B27/1804 (EP,US);
F04B27/14 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, SE [2004/42] |
Former [2002/46] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Regelventil für einen Verdichter variabler Verdrängung | [2002/46] | English: | Control valve for variable displacement compressor | [2002/46] | French: | Soupape de commande pour un compresseur à capacité variable | [2002/46] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 18.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4815300 (SUZUKI NOBUHIKO [JP]) [A] 1-11 * figures 1,3 * * abstract *; | [A]EP0945617 (SANDEN CORP [JP]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]EP1095804 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]) [A] 6-9* abstract * |