EP1271834 - Method for controlling data transmission in a radio communications system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | [2007/32] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hwang, Seung-Hoon 102-1501, Seocho-Samseongnaemian Apt., 1641-1 Seocho 1-dong, Seocho-gu, Seoul / KR | 02 /
Kwon, Hyuck Chan 302-33, Bookgaja 2-Dong Seodaimoon-gu Seoul 120-813 / KR | [2003/05] |
Former [2003/01] | 01 /
Hwang, Seung-Hoon 102-1501, Seocho-Samseongnaemian Apt., 1641-1 Seocho 1-dong, Seocho-gu, Seoul / KR | ||
02 /
Kwon, Hyuck Chan 141-34, Yeonhui-dong Seodaemun-gu, Seoul / KR | Representative(s) | Urner, Peter Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Urner, Peter, Dipl.-Phys. TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02010682.9 | 13.05.2002 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | KR20010026062 | 14.05.2001 Original published format: KR 2001026062 | KR20010027774 | 21.05.2001 Original published format: KR 2001027774 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1271834 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1271834 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18, H04L12/28, H04L1/00 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
H04L1/1812 (EP,US);
H04B17/24 (EP,US);
H04L1/0001 (EP,US);
H04L1/0026 (EP,US);
H04L1/1671 (EP,US);
H04B17/309 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum steuern der Datenübertragung in einem Funkkommunikationssystem | [2003/01] | English: | Method for controlling data transmission in a radio communications system | [2003/01] | French: | Méthode pour controler la transmission des données dans un système de radiocommunication | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/18] | 18.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 25.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2006 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.07.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.08.2007 | BE | 08.08.2007 | CH | 08.08.2007 | CY | 08.08.2007 | DK | 08.08.2007 | FI | 08.08.2007 | LI | 08.08.2007 | NL | 08.08.2007 | TR | 08.08.2007 | SE | 08.11.2007 | GR | 09.11.2007 | ES | 19.11.2007 | PT | 08.01.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2009/33] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
CY | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
SE | 08.11.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
PT | 08.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
DK | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
BE | 08.08.2007 | ||
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
GR | 09.11.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 08.08.2007 | |
CH | 08.08.2007 | ||
FI | 08.08.2007 | ||
LI | 08.08.2007 | ||
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 08.08.2007 | |
NL | 08.08.2007 | ||
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 08.08.2007 | |
ES | 19.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 19.11.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0797327 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 5 - line 21 * * column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 5 * * column 3, line 13 - line 33 * * column 4, line 20 - line 40 * * column 8, line 57 - column 9, line 24 *; | [X] - MATOBA N ET AL, "Performance of real-time video transmission using error control over Rayleigh and Rician fading channels", PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS, 1998. THE NINTH IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON BOSTON, MA, USA 8-11 SEPT. 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980908), ISBN 0-7803-4872-9, pages 1061 - 1065, XP010314660 [X] 1 * page 1061, column 2, line 11 - line 32 * * page 1062, column 2, line 47 - line 57 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PIMRC.1998.731338 |