EP1266968 - Microorganism producing fructosyl transferase and method for producing fructooligosaccharides and neofructooligosaccharides using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CJ Corporation 500 Namdaemunro 5-Ga Jung-gu Seoul, 100-095 / KR | [2006/35] |
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states CJ Corporation Namdaemun-ro 5ga 500, Jung-gu Seoul, 100-802 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Han, Joon Sang Samik Apt. 203-303, 166 Songpa-dong, Songpa-gu Seoul 138-170 / KR | 02 /
Park, Kang June Kunyoung Apt. 115-104, Dongchun-dong, Yeonsu-gu Incheon-si 406-130 / KR | 03 /
Shin, Dae Sub Sungwon Apt. 102-1305, Yangpyung-dong-3-ga Yeondeungpo-gu, Seoul 150-103 / KR | 04 /
Kim, Jung Hoon Hyundai Apt.102-114, 1648-2 Seocho-1-dong Seochogu Seoul 137-880 / KR | 05 /
Kim, Jin Chul Woosung Apt. Yeonsu-2-dong, Yeonsu-gu Incheon-si 406-112 / KR | 06 /
Lee, Ki Chang Sunngi Apt. 102-406, 13/9 Gwankyo-dong, Nam-gu Incheon-si 402-800 / KR | 07 /
Lee, Woon Hwa Sungbo Apt. C-406, Yeoksam-2-dong, Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-082 / KR | 08 /
Kim, Seung Wook Sunkyung Apt.101-1604,Jongam 1dong,34-3 Sungbuk-gu Seoul 136-769 / KR | 09 /
Park, Seung Won 679-5 Pungdukchun-ri, Suji-up Kyunggi-do 449-846 / KR | [2002/51] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02010741.3 | 14.05.2002 | [2002/51] | Priority number, date | KR20010026111 | 14.05.2001 Original published format: KR 2001026111 | KR20020004445 | 25.01.2002 Original published format: KR 2002004445 | [2002/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1266968 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1266968 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | [2003/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1266968 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/18, C12P19/04, C12N9/10, C12N11/04, C12N11/14, C07H3/06, // (C12P19/18, C12R1:80) | [2003/04] | CPC: |
C12P19/18 (EP);
C12N9/1051 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/51] | C12P19/18, C12P19/04, C12N9/10, C12N11/04, C12N11/14, // (C12P19/18, C12R1:80) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/51] | Title | German: | Fructosyl-Transferase produzierender Mikroorganismus und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Fructooligosacchariden und Neofructooligosacchariden unter dessen Verwendung | [2002/51] | English: | Microorganism producing fructosyl transferase and method for producing fructooligosaccharides and neofructooligosaccharides using the same | [2002/51] | French: | Micro-organisme produisant la fructosyl transférase et procédé de production de fructooligosaccharides et néofructooligosaccharides utilisant ce micro-organisme | [2002/51] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 06.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 23.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.08.2006 | BE | 30.08.2006 | CH | 30.08.2006 | CY | 30.08.2006 | FI | 30.08.2006 | IT | 30.08.2006 | LI | 30.08.2006 | NL | 30.08.2006 | TR | 30.08.2006 | DK | 30.11.2006 | SE | 30.11.2006 | GR | 01.12.2006 | ES | 11.12.2006 | PT | 12.02.2007 | IE | 14.05.2007 | LU | 14.05.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
BE | 30.08.2006 | ||
CH | 30.08.2006 | ||
CY | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
LI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
IE | 14.05.2007 | ||
LU | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
BE | 30.08.2006 | ||
CH | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
LI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
IE | 14.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
BE | 30.08.2006 | ||
CH | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
LI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
BE | 30.08.2006 | ||
CH | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
LI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
BE | 30.08.2006 | ||
CH | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
LI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
CH | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
LI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 30.08.2006 | |
CH | 30.08.2006 | ||
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
LI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 30.08.2006 | |
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
LI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 30.08.2006 | |
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
LI | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CH | 30.08.2006 | |
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
LI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | CH | 30.08.2006 | |
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
LI | 30.08.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]JPH10165192 ; | [A]JPH04229186 ; | [AD]EP0307158 (JAPAN MAIZE PROD [JP]) [AD] 1-12 * Formula A, formula B; page 3, line 2 - page 4, line 40; example -; claim - *; | [XD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10165192 A 19980623 (SHINOHARA SATOSHI;NIPPON ORIGO KK) [XD] 1-12 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0009]; claim - * * paragraph [0013] * * formula 1 and 2 * | [X] - HAYASHI SACHIO ET AL, "Production of a novel syrup containing neofructo-oligosaccharides by the cells of Penicillium citrinum.", BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS, (200009), vol. 22, no. 18, ISSN 0141-5492, pages 1465 - 1469, XP008010080 [X] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1005627828876 | [PX] - JAE HEUNG LEE ET AL, "REACTION ROUTE FOR ENZYMATIC PRODUCTION OF NEOFRUCTO-OLIGOSACCHARIDES FROM SUCROSE USING PENICILLIUM CITRINUM CELLS", JOURNAL OF MICROBIOLOGY, SEOUL, KR, (200112), vol. 39, no. 4, ISSN 1225-8873, pages 331 - 333, XP001122870 [PX] 1-12 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921221), vol. 016, no. 581, Database accession no. (C - 1012), & JP04229186 A 19920818 (NIHON ORIGO KK) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | [AD] - GRIZARD D ET AL, "ENZYMATIC SYNTHESIS AND STRUCTURE DETERMINATION OF NEO-FOS", FOOD BIOTECHNOLOGY, DEKKER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199903), vol. 13, no. 1, ISSN 0890-5436, pages 93 - 105, XP008010095 [AD] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/08905439609549963 |