EP1260699 - Fuel supply system for engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | For all designated states Keihin Corporation 3-17, Shinjuku 4-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Keihin Corporation 3-17, Shinjuku 4-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wada, Tetsu c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Ikuma, Tomonori c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 03 /
Shidara, Sadafumi c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 04 /
Sakai, Makoto, c/o Kawasaki Development Center of Keihin Corporation, 386, Ichinotsubo, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 05 /
Ishikawa, Kazuki, c/o Kakuda Development Center of Keihin Corporation, 197-1, Aza Nagare, Kakuda Kakuda-shi, Miyagi / JP | 06 /
Takahashi, Nobuhiro, c/o Kakuda Development Center Keihin Corporation, 197-1, Aza Nagare, Kakuda Kakuda-shi, Miyagi / JP | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | Melzer, Wolfgang Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | Melzer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02010771.0 | 14.05.2002 | [2002/48] | Priority number, date | JP20010145398 | 15.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001145398 | [2002/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1260699 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1260699 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F02M37/20 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
F02B61/045 (EP,US);
F02M37/20 (EP,US);
F02M55/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2003/33] |
Former [2002/48] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kraftstoffversorgungssystem für Brennkraftmaschine | [2002/48] | English: | Fuel supply system for engine | [2002/48] | French: | Système d'alimentation de carburant pour moteur | [2002/48] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 08.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000110686 ; | [A]US5865160 (KATO MASAHIKO [JP]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 1 - line 7; figure 4 *; | [A]US5913294 (TAKAHASHI MASANORI [JP], et al) [A] 1* column 4, line 23 - line 40 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000929), vol. 2000, no. 07, & JP2000110686 A 20000418 (SANSHIN IND CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |