EP1262752 - Fiber polarimeter, its use, and polarimetric method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.2006 [2006/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THORLABS GmbH Gaussstrasse 11 85757 Karlsfeld / DE | [2005/14] |
Former [2003/22] | For all designated states Tektronix Munich GmbH Gaussstrasse 11 85757 Karlsfeld / DE | ||
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states Profile Optische Systeme GmbH Gausstrasse 11 85757 Karlsfeld / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peupelmann, Jens Halsbrücker Strasse 7 09633 Krummhennersdorf / DE | 02 /
Krause, Egbert Gartenweg 9b 09217 Burgstädt / DE | 03 /
Bandemer, Adalbert, Dr. Schöttlstrasse 2 85221 Dachau / DE | [2002/49] | Representative(s) | Schurack, Eduard F., et al ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Schurack, Eduard F., et al Hofstetter, Schurack & Skora Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02010847.8 | 15.05.2002 | [2002/49] | Priority number, date | DE2001124291 | 17.05.2001 Original published format: DE 10124291 | DE2002109826 | 06.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10209826 | [2002/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1262752 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1262752 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | [2003/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1262752 | Date: | 03.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G01J4/00 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
G02B6/274 (EP,US);
G01J4/00 (EP,US);
G02B6/276 (EP,US);
G02B6/02109 (EP,US);
G02B6/2766 (EP,US);
G02B6/29317 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2004/17] |
Former [2002/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Faser-Polarimeter, dessen Verwendung sowie polarimetrisches Verfahren | [2002/49] | English: | Fiber polarimeter, its use, and polarimetric method | [2002/49] | French: | Polarimètre à fibre, son utilisation, ainsi qu'une méthode polarimétrique | [2002/49] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 22.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 16.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.03.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.03.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6211957 (ERDOGAN TURAN [US], et al) [X] 1,17 * column 5, line 1 - column 6, line 15; figure 1 *; | [X] - BOUZID A ET AL, "Fiber-optic four-detector polarimeter", OPTICS COMMUNICATIONS, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING CO. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19950715), vol. 118, no. 3, ISSN 0030-4018, pages 329 - 334, XP004062172 [X] 1,17 * paragraph [0002]; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0030-4018(95)00194-D | [A] - ERDOGAN T ET AL, "TILTED FIBER PHASE GRATINGS", JOURNAL OF THE OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA - A, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, WASHINGTON, US, (19960201), vol. 13, no. 2, ISSN 1084-7529, pages 296 - 313, XP002055129 [A] 1,17 * page 300 - page 306 * |