EP1278184 - Method for coding speech and music signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROSOFT CORPORATION One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2003/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koishida, Kazuhuito 7507 146th Avenue NE Redmond, Washington 98052 / US | 02 /
Cuperman, Vladimir 5635 Cielo Avenue Goleta, California 93117 / US | 03 /
Majidimehr, Amir, H. 14824 164 Place NE Woodinville, Washington 98072 / US | 04 /
Gersho, Allen 4604 Via Gennita Santa Barbara, California 93111 / US | [2003/04] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02010879.1 | 15.05.2002 | [2003/04] | Priority number, date | US20010892105 | 26.06.2001 Original published format: US 892105 | [2003/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1278184 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1278184 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | [2004/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1278184 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/14 | [2003/04] | CPC: |
G10L19/18 (EP,US);
G10L19/0212 (EP,US);
G10L19/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/04] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Kodierung von Sprach- und Musiksignalen | [2007/27] | English: | Method for coding speech and music signals | [2003/04] | French: | Procédé pour le codage de signaux de parole et musique | [2003/04] |
Former [2003/04] | Verfahren zur Kodierung von Sprach- und Muziksignalen | Examination procedure | 16.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 26.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 05.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.03.2008 | BE | 05.03.2008 | CY | 05.03.2008 | DK | 05.03.2008 | FI | 05.03.2008 | NL | 05.03.2008 | TR | 05.03.2008 | IE | 15.05.2008 | LU | 15.05.2008 | CH | 31.05.2008 | LI | 31.05.2008 | MC | 31.05.2008 | SE | 05.06.2008 | GR | 06.06.2008 | ES | 16.06.2008 | PT | 05.08.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
CY | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
TR | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 15.05.2008 | ||
LU | 15.05.2008 | ||
CH | 31.05.2008 | ||
LI | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
CY | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 15.05.2008 | ||
LU | 15.05.2008 | ||
CH | 31.05.2008 | ||
LI | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/42] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
CY | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 15.05.2008 | ||
CH | 31.05.2008 | ||
LI | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
IE | 15.05.2008 | ||
CH | 31.05.2008 | ||
LI | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
CH | 31.05.2008 | ||
LI | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
DK | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
NL | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
PT | 05.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
SE | 05.06.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
BE | 05.03.2008 | ||
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | AT | 05.03.2008 | |
FI | 05.03.2008 | ||
ES | 16.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | ES | 16.06.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6134518 (COHEN GILAD [IL], et al) [A] 1,6,11 * column 1, lines 13-17 ** column 2, lines 19-67; figures 1,2 *; | [XA] - BESSETTE B ET AL, "A wideband speech and audio codec at 16/24/32 kbit/s using hybrid ACELP/TCX techniques", SPEECH CODING PROCEEDINGS, 1999 IEEE WORKSHOP ON PORVOO, FINLAND 20-23 JUNE 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19990620), ISBN 0-7803-5651-9, pages 7 - 9, XP010345581 [X] 1,3,6,8,10-13 * abstract * * page 7, column R, paragraphs 4-6 * * page 8, column L, paragraph 4 - column R, paragraph 1 * * page 9, column L, paragraphs 2-5; figure 1 * [A] 2,4,5,7,9,14,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SCFT.1999.781466 | [A] - SALAMI R ET AL, "A wideband codec at 16/24 kbit/s with 10 ms frames", SPEECH CODING FOR TELECOMMUNICATIONS PROCEEDING, 1997, 1997 IEEE WORKSHOP ON POCONO MANOR, PA, USA 7-10 SEPT. 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19970907), ISBN 0-7803-4073-6, pages 103 - 104, XP010246023 [A] 1,6,11 * abstract * * page 103, column L, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SCFT.1997.623917 |