EP1312303 - Implantable amplifier for neuroelectrical signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.2010 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neurostream Technologies General Partnership 4780 rue Saint-Felix Suite 105 Saint-Augustin-de- Desmaures Quebec QC G3A 2J9 / CA | [2009/51] |
Former [2003/21] | For all designated states Neurostream Technologies Inc. 301-2099 Lougheed Highway Port Coquitlam, British Columbia V3B 1A8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fassio, Marcelo Daniel Baru 210-7080 Inlet Drive Burnaby, British Columbia V5A 1C1 / CA | [2003/21] | Representative(s) | Locke, Andrew Robert, et al Barker Brettell LLP Medina Chambers Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/20] | Locke, Andrew Robert, et al Barker Brettell LLP Medina Chambers Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | ||
Former [2004/20] | Lomas, Geoffrey Michael, et al Barker Brettell Medina Chambers, Town Quay Southampton SO14 2AQ / GB | ||
Former [2003/21] | Cioni, Carlo c/o STUDIO CIONI & PIPPARELLI Viale Caldara 38 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02011596.0 | 28.05.2002 | [2003/21] | Priority number, date | US20010988112 | 19.11.2001 Original published format: US 988112 | [2003/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1312303 | Date: | 21.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1312303 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | [2003/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1312303 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/04 | [2003/21] | CPC: |
A61B5/24 (EP,US);
A61B5/0031 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2004/20] |
Former [2004/15] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Implantierbarer Verstärker für neuroelektrische Signale | [2003/21] | English: | Implantable amplifier for neuroelectrical signals | [2003/21] | French: | Amplificateur implantable pour des signaux neuroélectriques | [2003/21] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/20] | 09.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.02.2004 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   12.03.2004 | 17.02.2004 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   12.03.2004 | 17.02.2004 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   12.03.2004 | 17.02.2004 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   12.03.2004 | 17.02.2004 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   12.03.2004 | 17.02.2004 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   12.03.2004 | 17.02.2004 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   12.03.2004 | 17.02.2004 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   12.03.2004 | 17.02.2004 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   12.03.2004 | 17.02.2004 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   12.03.2004 | 17.02.2004 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   12.03.2004 | 17.02.2004 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   12.03.2004 | 17.02.2004 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   12.03.2004 | 17.02.2004 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   12.03.2004 | 17.02.2004 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   12.03.2004 | 17.02.2004 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   12.03.2004 | 17.02.2004 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   12.03.2004 | 17.02.2004 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   12.03.2004 | 17.02.2004 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   12.03.2004 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.02.2004 | M01   Fee paid on   12.03.2004 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.12.2009 | BE | 30.12.2009 | CY | 30.12.2009 | DK | 30.12.2009 | FI | 30.12.2009 | IT | 30.12.2009 | NL | 30.12.2009 | SE | 30.12.2009 | TR | 30.12.2009 | GR | 31.03.2010 | ES | 10.04.2010 | PT | 30.04.2010 | IE | 28.05.2010 | LU | 28.05.2010 | CH | 31.05.2010 | LI | 31.05.2010 | MC | 31.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
BE | 30.12.2009 | ||
CY | 30.12.2009 | ||
DK | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IT | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.05.2010 | ||
LU | 28.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
BE | 30.12.2009 | ||
CY | 30.12.2009 | ||
DK | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IT | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.05.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
BE | 30.12.2009 | ||
CY | 30.12.2009 | ||
DK | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
IT | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
BE | 30.12.2009 | ||
CY | 30.12.2009 | ||
DK | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
CH | 31.05.2010 | ||
LI | 31.05.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
BE | 30.12.2009 | ||
CY | 30.12.2009 | ||
DK | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
BE | 30.12.2009 | ||
CY | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
BE | 30.12.2009 | ||
CY | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
GR | 31.03.2010 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
BE | 30.12.2009 | ||
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
NL | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
PT | 30.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
ES | 10.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 30.12.2009 | |
FI | 30.12.2009 | ||
SE | 30.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 30.12.2009 | |
SE | 30.12.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3927377 (IWAZUMI TATSUO) [Y] 19-27 * abstract ** column 2, line 50 - line 55 *; | [XY] - KIM K H ET AL, "NOISE CHARACTERISTIC DESIGN OF CMOS SOURCE FOLLOWER AND VOLTAGE AMPLIFIER FOR ACTIVE SEMICONDUCTOR MICRO ELECTRODES FOR NEURAL SIGNAL RECORDING", MEDICAL AND BIOLOGICAL ENGINEERING AND COMPUTING, PETER PEREGRINUS LTD. STEVENAGE, GB, (200007), vol. 38, no. 4, ISSN 0140-0118, pages 469 - 472, XP000937055 [X] 1,6 * paragraph [0001]; figure 4 * [Y] 19-27 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02345018 | by applicant | - "oise Characteristic Design of CMOS Source Follower and Voltage Amplifier for Active Semiconductor Micro Electrodes for Neural Signal Recording", KIM K H ET AL., Medical and Biological Engineering and Computing, PETER PEREGRINUS LTD., (200007), vol. 38, pages 469 - 472 |