EP1262975 - Disc drive device with speed control means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suetomo, Tohru 212-112-101, Taguchi, Saijo-cho Higashihirishima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 02 /
Kawasaki, Masahiro 1-31-25, Toshimatsu, Saeki-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 03 /
Imada, Masayuki 2-6-8, Shinonome, Minami-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | 04 /
Yamamoto, Yoichi 1-1-8-207, Suzugadai, Inokuchi, Nishi-ku Hiroshima-shi, Hiroshima-ken / JP | [2002/49] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler, Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/49] | Lang, Johannes, Dipl.-Ing. Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler Isenbruck, Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02011636.4 | 29.05.2002 | [2002/49] | Priority number, date | JP20010164468 | 31.05.2001 Original published format: JP 2001164468 | [2002/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1262975 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/12, G11B27/00, G11B19/02 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
G11B20/1258 (EP,US);
G11B19/04 (EP,US);
G11B19/26 (EP,US);
G11B20/1252 (EP,US);
G11B20/18 (EP,US);
G11B27/005 (EP,US);
G11B27/105 (EP,US);
G11B2020/10944 (EP,US);
G11B2020/183 (EP,US);
G11B2220/216 (EP,US);
G11B2220/218 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2562 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2575 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Plattenlaufwerksvorrichtung mit Geschwindigkeitssteuerung | [2002/49] | English: | Disc drive device with speed control means | [2002/49] | French: | Dispositif d' unité de disque avec commande de vitesse | [2002/49] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |