EP1283412 - Method for detecting a filling process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/07] | Method and apparatus for detecting a filling process | ||
[2013/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VEGA Grieshaber KG Hauptstrasse 1 - 5 77709 Wolfach / DE | [2013/29] |
Former [2003/07] | For all designated states VEGA Grieshaber KG Hauptstr. 1 - 5 77709 Wolfach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laun, Robert Breitenbachstrasse 43 a 77756 Hausach / DE | 02 /
Haas, Dieter Schramberger Strasse 14 78730 Lauterbach / DE | [2003/07] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | ||
Former [2003/07] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Waldstrasse 33 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 02011726.3 | 27.05.2002 | [2003/07] | Priority number, date | DE2001139242 | 09.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10139242 | [2003/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1283412 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1283412 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | [2004/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1283412 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/296, G01F23/284, G01F25/00 | [2003/07] | CPC: |
G01F23/2965 (EP,US);
G01F23/284 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2005/11] |
Former [2003/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Erfassen eines Befüllvorganges | [2013/14] | English: | Method for detecting a filling process | [2013/14] | French: | Procédé de détection d'une opération de remplissage | [2013/14] |
Former [2003/07] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Erfassen eines Befüllvorganges | ||
Former [2003/07] | Method and apparatus for detecting a filling process | ||
Former [2003/07] | Procédé et dispositif de détection d'une opération de remplissage | Examination procedure | 14.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 24.12.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.04.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, TR | 15.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.03.2013 | 06.03.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2006 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.01.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.01.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE3337690 (VEGA GRIESHABER GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-3,10-13 * the whole document * [A] 4-9; | [XA]DE4218303 (ENDRESS HAUSER GMBH CO [DE]) [X] 1,13 * page 4, line 27 - line 33 * [A] 2-12; | [A]DE4234300 (VEGA GRIESHABER GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [XA]DE4332071 (ENDRESS HAUSER GMBH CO [DE]) [X] 1-6,10-13 * the whole document * [A] 7-9; | [XA]EP0961106 (ENDRESS HAUSER GMBH CO [DE]) [X] 1,13 * column 10, line 43 - line 48 * [A] 2-12; | [XA]EP1014049 (HORST MICHAEL DIPL ING [DE]) [X] 1,13 * the whole document * [A] 2-12 | by applicant | DE3337690 | DE4234300 | DE4332071 | EP0961106 |