EP1366781 - Apparatus for treating a body part using an electromagnetic field [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2007 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Markoll, Richard, Dr. Implerstrasse 71 81371 München / DE | [2003/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/49] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/49] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02011946.7 | 29.05.2002 | [2003/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1366781 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1366781 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61N2/02 | [2003/49] | CPC: |
A61N2/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, PT [2004/35] |
Former [2003/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Behandlung eines menschlichen Körperteils mittels eines elektromagnetischen Feldes | [2003/49] | English: | Apparatus for treating a body part using an electromagnetic field | [2003/49] | French: | Appareil pour traiter une partie du corps humain avec un champ électromagnétique | [2003/49] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/32] | 04.06.2004 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.09.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, SE, TR | 22.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.07.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.07.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.12.2006 | [2007/28] | Documents cited: | Search | [XDA]US5131904 (MARKOLL RICHARD DR [DE]) [XD] 1 * column 2, line 46 - column 4, line 3; figure -; claim - * [A] 2,3,5,7,8; | [XA]EP0824025 (MUNTERMANN AXEL [DE]) [X] 1 * page 4, column 5, line 1 - column 6, line 14; figure -; claim - * [A] 7; | [A]WO0115770 (CANEDO LUIS [MX]) [A] 1,5,7,8* page 10, line 26 - page 11, line 37; figure -; claim - * | by applicant | US5131904 |