EP1264969 - Apparatus and method for detecting change of neutral position of valve of electromagnetic valve actuation system, and apparatus and method for controlling the valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2003 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.10.2003 [2003/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yanai, Akihiro c/o TOYOTA Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha, 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2002/50] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02012618.1 | 06.06.2002 | [2002/50] | Priority number, date | JP20010173328 | 08.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001173328 | [2002/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1264969 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1264969 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | [2003/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F01L9/04 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
F01L9/20 (EP,US);
F01L2009/2136 (EP,US);
F01L2009/2148 (EP,US);
F01L2009/2169 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Einrichtung und Verfahren zur Detektion einer neutralen Ventilposition in einem elektromagnetischem Ventilsteurungssystem und Einrichtung und Verfahren zur Ventilsteuerung | [2002/50] | English: | Apparatus and method for detecting change of neutral position of valve of electromagnetic valve actuation system, and apparatus and method for controlling the valve | [2002/50] | French: | Dispositif et méthode de détection de modification de la position d'équilibre d'une soupape dans le cas d'un système d'actionnement électromagnétique de soupape, dispositif et méthode de commande de soupape | [2002/50] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/50] | 14.08.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5775278 (MORIYA TAKASHI [JP], et al); | [AP]EP1136659 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [AP] 1,11 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007]; figure -; claim - * | by applicant | JP2000008894 | JP2000161032 |