EP1264873 - Oxynitride phosphor activated by a rare earth element, and sialon type phosphor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.04.2012 [2012/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Institute for Materials Science 2-1, Sengen 1-chome Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki / JP | [2011/18] |
Former [2002/50] | For all designated states National Institute for Materials Science 2-1, Sengen 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mitomo, Mamoru, c/o National Institute for Materials Science 2-1, Sengen 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki / JP | 02 /
Endo, Tadashi, c/o School of Engineering Tohoku University 07, Aza-Aoba, Aramaki, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi / JP | 03 /
Ueda, Kyouta, c/o School of Engineering Tohoku University 07, Aza-Aoba, Aramaki, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi / JP | 04 /
Komatsu, Masakazu, c/o School of Engineering Tohoku University 07, Aza-Aoba, Aramaki, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi / JP | [2011/18] |
Former [2002/50] | 01 /
Mitomo, Mamoru, c/oNational Inst.Materials Science 2-1, Sengen 1-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki / JP | ||
02 /
Endo, Tadashi, c/oSchool of Enginee., Tohoku Univ. 07, Aza-Aoba, Aramaki, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi / JP | |||
03 /
Ueda, Kyouta, c/oSchool of Enginee., Tohoku Univ. 07, Aza-Aoba, Aramaki, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi / JP | |||
04 /
Komatsu, Masakazu, c/oSchool of Engi., Tohoku Univ 07, Aza-Aoba, Aramaki, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi, Miyagi / JP | Representative(s) | Hartz, Nikolai, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/50] | Hartz, Nikolai F., Dr., et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz, Patentanwälte, Tal 29 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02012727.0 | 07.06.2002 | [2002/50] | Priority number, date | JP20010171831 | 07.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001171831 | JP20020149022 | 23.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002149022 | [2002/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1264873 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1264873 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | [2005/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1264873 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/80 | [2002/50] | CPC: |
C04B35/597 (EP,US);
C09K11/77928 (EP,US);
C09K11/0883 (EP,US);
C09K11/77068 (EP,US);
C09K11/77348 (EP,US);
C09K11/77498 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3206 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3208 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3224 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3225 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3229 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3865 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, NL [2006/27] |
Former [2002/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Aktiviertes Seltenerde-Element Oxynitride-Phosphor und Sialon -Phosphor | [2002/50] | English: | Oxynitride phosphor activated by a rare earth element, and sialon type phosphor | [2002/50] | French: | Phosphore d'oxynitrure activé par une terre rare,et phosphore de type sialon | [2002/50] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 07.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.11.2007 | 30.10.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.11.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 20.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08012606.3 / EP2017323 | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - MANDAL H ET AL, "beta Sialon Transformation in Calcium-containing alpha-SiAlON Ceramics", JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN CERAMIC SOCIETY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, ESSEX, GB, (199905), vol. 19, no. 5, ISSN 0955-2219, pages 543 - 552, XP004160637 [X] 1-8 * column 3, paragraph 3 * * column 4, paragraph 1 * * column 6, paragraph 1 * * column 14, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0955-2219(98)00251-9 | [X] - VAN KREVEL J W H ET AL, "On the Ce<3+> luminescence in the melilite-type oxide nitride compound Y2Si3-xAlxO3+xN4-x", MATERIALS RESEARCH BULLETIN, PERGAMON PRESS, NEW YORK, US, (20000315), vol. 35, no. 5, ISSN 0025-5408, pages 747 - 754, XP004215129 [X] 1,3-5 * page 748, paragraph 1 * * page 750, paragraph 1 * * page 753, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0025-5408(00)00265-8 | [X] - SHEN Z ET AL, "EU-DOPED ALPHA-SIALON AND RELATED PHASES", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE LETTERS, CHAPMAN AND HALL LTD. LONDON, GB, (19981015), vol. 17, no. 20, ISSN 0261-8028, pages 1703 - 1706, XP000851300 [X] 1,3-5 * page 1703, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 1704, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1006662815869 | [X] - MANDAL H, HOFFMANN M.J., "Preparation of multiple-cation alfa-SIAlON ceramics containing Lanthanum", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CERAMIC SOCIETY, (1999), vol. 82, no. 1, pages 229 - 232, XP002343000 [X] 1,3-5 * column 1, paragraphs 1,3 * * column 2, paragraph 3 * * column 6, paragraph 2 * | [A] - MANDAL H ET AL, "COMPARISON OF THE EFFECTIVENESS OF RARE-EARTH SINTERING ADDITIVES ON THE HIGH-TEMPERATURE STABILITY OF ALPHA-SIALON CERAMICS", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE, CHAPMAN AND HALL LTD. LONDON, GB, (19951201), vol. 30, no. 23, ISSN 0022-2461, pages 5901 - 5909, XP000553514 [A] 1-8 * page 5901, paragraph 3 * * page 5902, paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF01151503 | Examination | - VAN KREVEL J., "Chapter 11: Luminescence properties of rare earth doped alfa-SiAlON materials", TU EINDHOVEN, (2000), pages 145 - 157, XP008060386 | by applicant | JPS60206889 | JP2001214162 |