EP1245366 - Locking means for controlling the flow of a flowable medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.2005 [2005/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kreyenborg Verwaltungen und Beteiligungen GmbH & Co. KG Coermühle 1 48157 Münster / DE | [2003/13] |
Former [2003/11] | For all designated states Kreyenborg Verwaltung und Beteiligungen GmbH & Co. KG Coermühle 1 48157 Münster / DE | ||
Former [2002/40] | For all designated states Kreyenborn Verwaltung und Beteiligungen GmbH & Co. KG Coermühle 1 48157 Münster / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kreyenborg, Jan-Udo Alerdink 48145 Münster / DE | 02 /
Stude, Rolf-Rüdiger Schneidemühler Strasse 32 48157 Münster / DE | [2002/40] | Representative(s) | Habbel, Hans-Georg Am Kanonengraben 11 48151 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/40] | Habbel, Hans-Georg, Dipl.-Ing. Am Kanonengraben 11 48151 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 02012772.6 | 03.04.1999 | [2002/40] | Priority number, date | DE1998119195 | 30.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19819195 | DE1998134302 | 30.07.1998 Original published format: DE 19834302 | [2002/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1245366 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1245366 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | [2002/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1245366 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/68 | [2002/40] | CPC: |
B29C48/273 (EP,US);
B29C48/69 (EP,US);
B29C48/6912 (EP,US);
B29C48/03 (EP,US);
B29C48/2545 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, IT [2002/40] | Title | German: | Sperrmittel zur Steuerung des Durchflusses eines fliessfähigen Mediums | [2002/40] | English: | Locking means for controlling the flow of a flowable medium | [2002/40] | French: | Mécanisme de blocage pour le contrôle du flux d'un milieu coulant | [2002/40] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2002 | Examination requested [2002/46] | 17.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP99948547.7 / EP1082205 | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 10.06.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   19.11.2002 | 10.06.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   19.11.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE4218756 (KREYENBORG VERWALTUNGEN) [DA] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]DE29517140U (KREYENBORG VERWALTUNGEN [DE]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [PXA]EP0875357 (KREYENBORG VERWALTUNGEN [DE]) [PX] 1-7 * the whole document * [A] 8-10 |