EP1285840 - An apparatus that mounts a steering shaft to a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW Automotive U.S. LLC 12025 Tech Center Drive Livonia, MI 48150 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states TRW Automotive U.S. LLC 12025 Tech Center Drive Livonia Michigan 48150 / US | ||
Former [2004/10] | For all designated states TRW Automotive U.S. LLC 12025 Tech Center Drive Livonia, Michigan 48150 / US | ||
Former [2003/09] | For all designated states TRW INC. 1900 Richmond Road Lyndhurst Ohio 44124 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cartwright, Mark A. 1842 Sheridan West Lafayette, Indiana 47906 / US | [2003/09] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/09] | Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing., et al WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02012841.9 | 10.06.2002 | [2003/09] | Priority number, date | US20010934124 | 21.08.2001 Original published format: US 934124 | [2003/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1285840 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1285840 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | [2003/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1285840 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B62D1/16 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
B62D1/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/01] |
Former [2003/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung, welche eine Lenkspindel an einem Fahrzeug befestigt | [2003/09] | English: | An apparatus that mounts a steering shaft to a vehicle | [2003/09] | French: | Appareil qui monte un arbe de direction à un véhicule | [2003/09] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2003 | Examination requested [2003/48] | 03.10.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.01.2004 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 16.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.11.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.11.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5802221 (LUETHI RUDOLF [CH], et al) [A] 1,2,10 * column 1, line 28 - line 31 * * column 1, line 36 - line 40 * * column 1, line 45 - line 53 * * column 1, line 56 - line 60 * * column 1, line 65 - line 67 * * column 2, line 57 - line 59 ** figure 1; claim 1 *; | [E]EP1241071 (TRW INC [US]) [E] 1,2,5,10,11 * paragraphs [0011] - [0013] - [0020]; figures 1-3 * |