EP1267590 - Contents presenting system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [2006/33] |
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states Pioneer Corporation 4-1 Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shioda, Takehiko, Pioneer Corporation No.1-1, Fujimi 6-chome, Tsurugashima-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Toyama, Soichi, Pioneer Corporation No.1-1, Fujimi 6-chome, Tsurugashima-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Yamauchi, Keiichi, Pioneer Corporation No.1-1, Fujimi 6-chome, Tsurugashima-shi Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Shibasaki, Hiroaki, Pioneer Corporation No.4-1, Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | 05 /
Amano, Hideki, Pioneer Corporation No.4-1, Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [2006/18] |
Former [2002/51] | 01 /
Shioda, Takehiko, Pioneer Corporation No.4-1, Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | ||
02 /
Toyama, Soichi, Pioneer Corporation No.4-1, Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | |||
03 /
Yamauchi, Keiichi, Pioneer Corporation No.4-1, Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | |||
04 /
Shibasaki, Hiroaki, Pioneer Corporation No.4-1, Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | |||
05 /
Amano, Hideki, Pioneer Corporation No.4-1, Meguro 1-chome, Meguro-ku Tokyo-to / JP | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstraße 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02012937.5 | 11.06.2002 | [2002/51] | Priority number, date | JP20010175648 | 11.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001175648 | [2002/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1267590 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1267590 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | [2004/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1267590 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G10L17/00, G10L15/26 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
G10L17/26 (EP,US);
G10L15/26 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/51] | H04R27/00, G06F3/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/13] |
Former [2002/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Inhaltsdarstellung | [2002/51] | English: | Contents presenting system and method | [2002/51] | French: | Système et procédé de représentation de contenus | [2002/51] | Examination procedure | 30.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 10.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06114171.9 / EP1693831 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH11126092 ; | [X]US5625748 (MCDONOUGH JOHN W [US], et al) [X] 1,5-7 * abstract * * column 4, line 25 - line 57 *; | [XY]EP1076329 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-3,10-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0045] , [0056] * [Y] 4,5; | [XA]WO0116936 (ANDERSEN CONSULTING LLP [US]) [X] 1,10-14 * abstract * * page 16, line 33 - page 17, line 5 * * page 21, line 1 - line 11 * * page 75, line 16 - line 26 * * page 76, line 8 - line 20 *[A] 4,5; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990831), vol. 1999, no. 10, & JP11126092 A 19990511 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,8,9 * abstract * | [Y] - THOMAS S POLZIN AND ALEXANDER WAIBEL, "EMOTION-SENSITIVE HUMAN-COMPUTER INTERFACES", ISCA TUTORIAL AND RESEARCH WORKSHOP ON SPEECH AND EMOTION, Newcastle, Northern Ireland, UK, (20000905), pages 201 - 206, XP007005778 [Y] 4,5 * page 205, column R, line 30 - line 35 * |