EP1287810 - Hair gel comprising itaconic acid monoester acrylates copolymer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/10] | Hair gel comprising Itaconic acid monoester acrylates copolymer | ||
[2005/44] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 05.09.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wella Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Allee 65 64274 Darmstadt / DE | [2003/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Birkel, Susanne, Dr. Felsingerstrasse 33 64285 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
Wendel, Harald Grabengasse 3 64372 Ober-Ramstadt / DE | 03 /
Franzke, Michael, Dr. Darmstädter Weg 41 64380 Rossdorf / DE | 04 /
Niesig, Silke Am Wittumsacker 2B 64401 Gross-Bieberau / DE | [2003/10] | Application number, filing date | 02012961.5 | 12.06.2002 | [2003/10] | Priority number, date | DE2001142476 | 31.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10142476 | [2003/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1287810 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1287810 | Date: | 02.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/44] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1287810 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | [2007/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/06, A61K7/11, A61K7/13 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
A61Q5/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/042 (EP,US);
A61K8/8152 (EP,US);
A61Q5/065 (EP,US);
A61K2800/43 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/10] | Title | German: | Itaconsäuremonoester/Acrylat Copolymer enthaltendes, gelförmiges Haarbehandlungsmittel | [2003/10] | English: | Hair gel comprising itaconic acid monoester acrylates copolymer | [2005/44] | French: | Gel pour traitement des cheveux comprenant copolymère acide itaconique monoester/acrylat | [2003/10] |
Former [2003/10] | Hair gel comprising Itaconic acid monoester acrylates copolymer | Examination procedure | 21.06.2002 | Examination requested [2003/10] | 16.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.08.2006
19.02.2007
WITHDRAWN National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation 1000 Uniquema Boulevard New Castle, Delaware 19720 / US Opponent's representative Held, Stephan, et al, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.08.2006
14.08.2006
WITHDRAWN National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation 1000 Uniquema Boulevard New Castle, Delaware 19720 / US Opponent's representative Held, Stephan, et al, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 03 29 81630 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.08.2006
National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation 1000 Uniquema Boulevard New Castle, Delaware 19720 / US Opponent's representative Held, Stephan, et al, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 03 29 81630 München / DE | 07.09.2006 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.03.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 01.06.2008 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2008/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.11.2005 | FI | 02.11.2005 | IE | 02.11.2005 | NL | 02.11.2005 | TR | 02.11.2005 | DK | 02.02.2006 | GR | 02.02.2006 | SE | 02.02.2006 | PT | 03.04.2006 | AT | 12.06.2006 | LU | 12.06.2006 | BE | 30.06.2006 | CH | 30.06.2006 | LI | 30.06.2006 | MC | 30.06.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | FI | 02.11.2005 | |
IE | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
TR | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
AT | 12.06.2006 | ||
LU | 12.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
CH | 30.06.2006 | ||
LI | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | FI | 02.11.2005 | |
IE | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
AT | 12.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
CH | 30.06.2006 | ||
LI | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/30] | FI | 02.11.2005 | |
IE | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
CH | 30.06.2006 | ||
LI | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | FI | 02.11.2005 | |
IE | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | FI | 02.11.2005 | |
IE | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | FI | 02.11.2005 | |
IE | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
PT | 03.04.2006 | ||
Former [2006/40] | FI | 02.11.2005 | |
IE | 02.11.2005 | ||
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/38] | FI | 02.11.2005 | |
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
GR | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/35] | FI | 02.11.2005 | |
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
DK | 02.02.2006 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/27] | FI | 02.11.2005 | |
NL | 02.11.2005 | ||
SE | 02.02.2006 | ||
Former [2006/23] | FI | 02.11.2005 | |
NL | 02.11.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10158129 ; | [X]WO9937278 (EUGENE PERMA [FR], et al) [X] 1-13 * page 5, line 13 - line L; examples 1,2; claims 1,6,10,13 * * page 3, line 28 - line 30 *; | [X]WO9939688 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10 * page 3, paragraph 1; table 1 *; | [A]DE19816662 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-13 * page 3, line 39 - line 42; examples 1,2 *; | [X]US5972356 (PEFFLY MARJORIE MOSSMAN [US], et al) [X] 1-13 * example 11 *; | [PX]WO0200177 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [PX] 1,3,6-9,11-13 * page 3, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2; examples C,E; claims 1,7,8,12; table II *; | [PX]US2002042448 (SORRENTINO PAUL M [US], et al) [PX] 1-13 * example 1; claims 15-18 *; | [X] - NATIONAL STARCH & CHEMICAL * PERSONAL CARE, Modify rheology: STRUCTURE 2001/STRUCTURE 3001, XP002209084 [X] 1-13 * technical bulletin * * formulations * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10158129 A 19980616 (KANEBO LTD) [A] 12,13 * abstract * |