EP1277954 - Wind turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2006 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schlemenat, Alfred W. Dörnchen 2 45701 Herten / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | For all designated states Schlemenat, Alfred Dörnchen 2 45701 Herten / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/04] | Application number, filing date | 02013043.1 | 13.06.2002 | [2003/04] | Priority number, date | DE2001134829 | 17.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10134829 | DE2001141733 | 25.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10141733 | [2003/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1277954 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/04] | Classification | IPC: | F03D11/04 | [2003/04] | CPC: |
F03D7/0204 (EP,US);
F03D1/025 (EP);
F03D13/20 (EP,US);
F03D80/70 (US);
F03D9/25 (US);
F05B2240/913 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Windenergieanlage | [2003/04] | English: | Wind turbine | [2003/04] | French: | Eolienne | [2003/04] | Examination procedure | 31.12.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/31] | 10.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |