EP1275611 - Scissor type lifting table [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goss International Americas, Inc. 121 Broadway Street Dover, NH 03820 / US | [2004/46] |
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boucher, Ronald Henry 271 Tirrel Hill Road Goffstown, NH 03045 / US | 02 /
Hebert, Raymond Alphonse 53 Tebbetts Road Rochester, NH 03867 / US | [2003/03] | Representative(s) | Domenego, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Domenego, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2005/02] | Domenego, Bertrand, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2004/46] | Domenego, Bertrand Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 02013477.1 | 17.06.2002 | [2003/03] | Priority number, date | US20010901255 | 09.07.2001 Original published format: US 901255 | [2003/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1275611 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1275611 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B66F7/08 | [2003/03] | CPC: |
B66F7/08 (EP,US);
B66F7/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/03] | Title | German: | Scherenhubtisch | [2003/03] | English: | Scissor type lifting table | [2003/03] | French: | Table élévatrice à ciseaux | [2003/03] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/37] | 20.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 30.08.2006 | FI | 30.08.2006 | IE | 30.08.2006 | IT | 30.08.2006 | NL | 30.08.2006 | TR | 30.08.2006 | DK | 30.11.2006 | SE | 30.11.2006 | GR | 01.12.2006 | ES | 11.12.2006 | PT | 12.02.2007 | [2009/42] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 30.08.2006 | |
FI | 30.08.2006 | ||
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
GR | 01.12.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/37] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
IT | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
PT | 12.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/25] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
IE | 30.08.2006 | ||
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
DK | 30.11.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
NL | 30.08.2006 | ||
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
SE | 30.11.2006 | ||
ES | 11.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | FI | 30.08.2006 | |
SE | 30.11.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH1160174 ; | [X]US4558648 (FRANKLIN DUANE R [US], et al) [X] 1,3-10 * abstract * * column 13, line 60 - column 22, line 55 * * figures 2,4,5,8 *; | [DXA]US4712653 (FRANKLIN DUANE R [US], et al) [DX] 1,3-10 * abstract * * column 14, line 1 - column 24, line 6 * * figures 2,4,5,8,15-19 * [A] 2; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 19, Database accession no. 1999-225816, XP002216865 & JPH1160174 A 19990302 (KOMORI CORP) [A] 12 * abstract * |