EP1275867 - Dual clutch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2003/03] | Double clutch | ||
[2005/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 12.09.2007 [2007/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/03] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Damm, Ansgar, Dr. Innungswall 2e 38518 Gifhorn / DE | 02 /
Schreiber, Wolfgang, Dr. Buchenweg 12A 38550 Isenbüttel / DE | 03 /
Lutz, Wolf-Rüdiger, Dr. Greifswalder Strasse 2 38442 Wolfsburg / DE | 04 /
Becker, Volker Salzwedeler Strasse 17 38518 Gifhorn / DE | 05 /
Kruse, Georg Wittkampsring 1 38518 Gifhorn / DE | 06 /
Schade, Frank Holzkamp 16 38110 Braunschweig-Bevenrode / DE | [2003/03] | Representative(s) | Hübsch, Dirk, et al Hübsch & Weil Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 50 14 63 50974 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/44] | Hübsch, Dirk, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hübsch & Weil Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Ubierring 43 50678 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 02013489.6 | 17.06.2002 | [2003/03] | Priority number, date | DE2001134118 | 13.07.2001 Original published format: DE 10134118 | [2003/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1275867 | Date: | 15.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1275867 | Date: | 16.02.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16D21/06, F16D13/38 | [2003/03] | CPC: |
F16D21/06 (EP,US);
F16D25/0635 (US);
F16D25/082 (EP);
F16D25/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2003/40] |
Former [2003/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Doppelkupplung | [2003/03] | English: | Dual clutch | [2005/07] | French: | Embrayage double | [2003/03] |
Former [2003/03] | Double clutch | Examination procedure | 15.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/37] | 17.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 16.02.2005 | FR | 16.02.2005 | GB | 16.02.2005 | IT | 16.02.2005 | [2007/37] |
Former [2007/10] | ES | 16.02.2005 | |
FR | 16.02.2005 | ||
GB | 16.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/31] | FR | 16.02.2005 | |
GB | 16.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | GB | 16.02.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2510469 (GREENLEE HARRY R) [X] 1-12* column 3, lines 46-48; figure 1 *; | [X]DE887589 (AUTOMOBILES IND LATIL SA) [X] 1-12 * page 2, lines 98-101 * * page 2, lines 13-22; figure 5 *; | [X]FR1367133 (PORSCHE KG) [X] 1-12 * page 2, column 2, paragraph 2; figure 1 *; | [X]DE10004179 (MANNESMANN SACHS AG [DE]) [X] 1-12 * column 7, line 31 * * column 5, line 42 - line 43 * * column 6, line 49; figures 1,13 * |