EP1251564 - Non-volatile semiconductor memory device and manufacturing method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/43] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukumoto, Atsushi, Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
Shimizu, Satoshi, Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
Ohnakado, Takahiro, Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2002/43] | Representative(s) | Prüfer, Lutz H., et al PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/43] | Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys., et al PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02013734.5 | 09.05.2001 | [2002/43] | Priority number, date | JP20000221943 | 24.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000221943 | [2002/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1251564 | Date: | 23.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1251564 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/115, H01L21/8247, H01L21/336 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
H01L29/66825 (EP,US);
H10B99/00 (KR);
H10B41/30 (EP,US);
H10B69/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/43] | H01L27/115, H01L21/8247 | Designated contracting states | [2003/37] |
Former [2002/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Festwerthalbleiterspeicherbauelement und dessen Herstellungsverfahren | [2002/43] | English: | Non-volatile semiconductor memory device and manufacturing method thereof | [2002/43] | French: | Dispositif de mémoire semi-conductrice non-volatile et son procédé de fabrication | [2002/43] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/27] | 20.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/27] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01111341.2 / EP1178533 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.07.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.07.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.07.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.07.2003 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0372682 ; | [XA]US5190887 (TANG DANIEL N [US], et al) [X] 1,4-7 * the whole document * [A] 2,3; | [XA]EP0555039 (NAT SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US]) [X] 1,3-5 * the whole document * [A] 2; | [XY]US5366915 (KODAMA NORIAKI [JP]) [X] 1-6 * column 1, line 25 - column 5, line 68; figures 1A-5 * [Y] 7; | [XA]US5737264 (SHIRAI HIROKI [JP]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [A] 6,7; | [YA]US5891774 (UEDA NAOKI [JP], et al) [Y] 7 * the whole document * [A] 1-6; | [XA] - YOICHI OHSHIMA, "PROCESS AND DEVICE TECHNOLOGIES FOR 16MBIT EPROMS WITH LARGE-TILT- ANGLE IMPLANTED P-POCKET CELL", INTERNATIONAL ELECTRON DEVICES MEETING. SAN FRANCISCO, DEC. 9 - 12, 1990, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19901209), pages 95 - 98, XP000279543 [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [A] 6,7 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910618), vol. 015, no. 236, Database accession no. (E - 1078), & JP03072682 A 19910327 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-5 * abstract * |