EP1270576 - 3-phenyl-3,7-diazabicyclo[3,3,1]nonanes, process for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.10.2009 [2009/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay Pharmaceuticals GmbH Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | [2003/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schön, Uwe Föhrenkamp 12 31303 Burgdorf / DE | 02 /
Messinger, Josef Friedrich-Otto-Schott-Weg 3 31319 Sehnde / DE | 03 /
Brückner, Reinhard Homburgweg 8 30559 Hannover / DE | 04 /
Ziegler, Dieter Müggenwinkel 44 30966 Hemmingen / DE | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Bauriegel, Lutz Abbott Products GmbH IP Department (PH-ZP) Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Bauriegel, Lutz Solvay Pharmaceuticals GmbH, Patentabteilung, Hans-Böckler-Allee 20 30173 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 02013861.6 | 22.06.2002 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | DE2001131217 | 28.06.2001 Original published format: DE 10131217 | [2003/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1270576 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1270576 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | [2003/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1270576 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/08, A61K31/439, A61P9/00, C07D471/10, // (C07D471/08, 221:00, 221:00),(C07D471/10, 221:00, 221:00) | [2003/11] | CPC: |
C07D471/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/439 (KR);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
C07D471/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/01] | C07D487/08, A61K31/439, A61P9/00, // (C07D487/08, 221:00, 221:00) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Extension states | LT | 12.09.2003 | LV | 12.09.2003 | RO | 12.09.2003 | SI | 12.09.2003 | Title | German: | 3-Phenyl-3,7-diazabicyclo(3,3,1)nonan-Verbindungen sowie Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und diese Verbindungen enthaltende Arzneimittel | [2003/01] | English: | 3-phenyl-3,7-diazabicyclo[3,3,1]nonanes, process for their preparation and pharmaceutical compositions containing them | [2003/01] | French: | 3-Phenyl-3,7-diazabicyclo[3,3,1]nonanes, procédé pour leur préparation et compositions pharmaceutiques les contenant | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2003 | Examination requested [2003/46] | 17.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | TR | 15.09.2004 | [2009/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0103833 (KALI CHEMIE PHARMA GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,6,7 * page 19, line 18 - line 35; claim 1 *; | [AD]EP0306871 (KALI CHEMIE PHARMA GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,6,7* page 10, line 28 - line 32; claim 1 * |