EP1243661 - The use of certain substances for improving heat stability of RNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/39] | Method for reverse transcription | ||
[2007/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2008 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.03.2011 [2011/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Institute of Physical and Chemical Research 2-1, Hirosawa Wako-shi Saitama 351-01 / JP | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Dnaform 75-1, Ono-cho, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-0046 / JP | [2007/49] |
Former [2007/44] | For all designated states The Institute of Physical and Chemical Research 2-1, Hirosawa Wako-shi, Saitama 351-01 / JP | ||
For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Dnaform 75-1, Ono-cho, Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-0046 / JP | |||
Former [2002/39] | For all designated states The Institute of Physical and Chemical Research 2-1, Hirosawa Wako-shi, Saitama 351-01 / JP | ||
For all designated states Hayashizaki, Yoshihide The Institute of Physical and Chemical Research Tsukuba Life Science Centre, 1-1, Koyadai 3-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0074 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayashizaki, Yoshihide 22-8, Inarimae Tsubuka-shi, Ibaragi 305-0061 / JP | [2003/13] |
Former [2002/39] | 01 /
Hayashizaki, Yoshihide Tsukuka Life Science Center, 1-1, Koyadai 3-chome Tsubuka-shi, Ibaragi 305 / JP | Representative(s) | polypatent Patentanwälte An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/39] | Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | Application number, filing date | 02013871.5 | 24.07.1997 | [2002/39] | Priority number, date | JP19960196329 | 25.07.1996 Original published format: JP 19632996 | JP19960196331 | 25.07.1996 Original published format: JP 19633196 | [2002/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1243661 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1243661 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12N15/10, C07H21/02, C12N9/96 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
C12N15/1096 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6844 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6844, C12Q2527/101, C12Q2521/107 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6844, C12Q2527/125, C12Q2527/101, C12Q2521/107 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2002/39] | C12Q1/68, C12N15/10, C07H21/02, // C12N9/96 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2003/24] |
Former [2002/39] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verwendung bestimmter Substanzen für das Verbessern der Wärmestabilität von RNS | [2007/22] | English: | The use of certain substances for improving heat stability of RNA | [2007/22] | French: | L'utilisation de certaines substances pour améliorer la stabilité à la chaleur de l'ARN | [2007/22] |
Former [2002/39] | Verfahren für reverse Transkription | ||
Former [2002/39] | Method for reverse transcription | ||
Former [2002/39] | Méthode pour transcription inverse | Examination procedure | 25.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/17] | 19.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.11.2006 | 03.11.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.11.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 21.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97112672.7 / EP0821059 | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 05.12.2007 | LI | 05.12.2007 | NL | 05.12.2007 | SE | 05.03.2008 | DE | 06.03.2008 | IT | 31.07.2008 | [2011/13] |
Former [2008/48] | CH | 05.12.2007 | |
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | ||
DE | 06.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CH | 05.12.2007 | |
LI | 05.12.2007 | ||
NL | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]WO9109944 (CETUS CORP [US]) [X] 7-12 * page 8, line 5 - page 6, line 35 * * page 12, line 30 - page 13, line 7 * * page 18, line 10 - line 35 * * page 20, line 34 - page 21, line 6 * [A] 2-4 [Y] 1; | [A]EP0569272 (BIO MERIEUX [FR]) [A] 1-3,5,6 * page 3, column 42, line 4 - page 27 * * page 5, line 13 - line 56 *; | [X]WO9514770 (PACIFIC ENZYMES 1993 LIMITED [NZ], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * page 3, line 18 - line 23 * * page 12, line 1 - page 13, line 6 *; | [YA]DE4411588 (DEUTSCHES RHEUMA FORSCHUNGSZEN [DE]) [Y] 1 * page 2, line 27 - line 60 * * page 3, line 3 - line 5 * [A] 5-9; | [A] - SHIMOMAYE E TE AL., "Use of Avian Myeloblastosis virus reverse transcriptase at high temperature for sequence analysis of highly structured RNA", GENE ANALYSIS TECHNIQUES, NEW YORK US, (198903), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 25 - 28, XP002056580 [A] 1-3 * abstract * * page 26, column 2, line 2 - page 27, column 2, line 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0735-0651(89)90022-8 | [A] - "ENZYME STABILIZATION", ADVANCES IN BIOCHEMICAL ENGINEERING, NEW YORK US, (19790101), vol. 12, pages 55 - 67, XP000123113 [A] 1-3 * page 59, paragraph 1 - page 61, paragraph 3 * * page 64, paragraph L - page 67, paragraph 2 * | Examination | - ROTHENBERG E ET AL, "Increased length of DNA made by virions of murine leukemia virus at limiting magnesium ion concentration", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (197701), vol. 21, no. 1, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 168 - 178 |