EP1271796 - Code division multiple access system using a queue for each spread coefficient and method for controlling channel correction timing of the system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.11.2005 [2005/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hasegawa, Jun, Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba Int. Prop. Div., 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02013993.7 | 26.06.2002 | [2003/01] | Priority number, date | JP20010193325 | 26.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001193325 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1271796 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1271796 | Date: | 02.04.2003 | [2003/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1271796 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/707 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
H04B1/709 (EP,US);
H04B1/707 (EP,US);
H04B2201/70701 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/01] |
Former [2003/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Kodeverteilmehrfachzugriffsystem unter Verwendung einer Warteschlange für jeden Spreizkoeffizienten und Verfahren zum Steuern der Kanalkorrektionszeiten des Systems | [2003/01] | English: | Code division multiple access system using a queue for each spread coefficient and method for controlling channel correction timing of the system | [2003/01] | French: | Système d'acces multiple par division de code utilisant une file d'attente pour chaque coefficient d'étalage et procédé pour régler le synchronism de correction du canal du système | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 30.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0704987 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5619524 (LING FUYUN [US], et al) [Y] 1-21 * abstract * * column 2, line 58 - line 65 * * column 4, line 14 - line 18 * * column 8, line 12 - line 18 *; | [Y]EP0851600 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-21 * abstract * * column 1, line 35 - line 41 *; | [A]EP0932263 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO0021201 (ERICSSON INC [US]) [Y] 1-21 * abstract * * page 10, line 19 - page 11, line 14 *; | [A]EP1091501 (YOZAN INC [JP]) [A] 1-21* the whole document * |