EP1336917 - Disk subsystem with cross-call function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/34] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-8010 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mizuno, Makio, Hitachi, Ltd., Intell. Prop. Group New Marunouchi Bldg 5-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2003/34] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2003/34] | Application number, filing date | 02014853.2 | 04.07.2002 | [2003/34] | Priority number, date | JP20020037604 | 15.02.2002 Original published format: JP 2002037604 | [2003/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1336917 | Date: | 20.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1336917 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06 | [2003/34] | CPC: |
G06F3/0613 (EP,US);
G06F13/1663 (EP,US);
G06F3/0661 (EP,US);
G06F3/067 (EP,US);
G06F3/0689 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/38] |
Former [2003/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Festplattenuntersystem mit einer Kreuzverbindungsfunktion | [2003/34] | English: | Disk subsystem with cross-call function | [2003/34] | French: | Sous-système de disque avec function de connection croisée | [2003/34] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 21.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 19.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6092216 (KOBAYASHI TOHRU [JP], et al) [X] 1-15 * column 12, lines 18-39 * * column 19, line 12 - column 20, line 58 ** figures 21,23,24 * |