EP1273381 - Welding apparatus and method for forming electrical connections [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Erico International Corporation 30575 Bainbridge Road, Suite 300 Solon Ohio 44139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | For all designated states Erico International Corporation 30575 Bainbridge Road, Suite 300 Solon, Ohio 44139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cordier, Bernard J. Le Garet Perigneux 42380 / FR | 02 /
Quoy, Didier J.M. 25, rue Varizelle Saint Chamond 42400 / FR | 03 /
Hermans, Jacobus P. M. Heile Schoorstraat 64 Tilburg 5018 EG / NL | 04 /
van den Broek, Johannes L. L. A. Bijsterveldenlaan 123 Tilburg 5045 ZW / NL | [2004/36] |
Former [2003/02] | 01 /
Cordier, Bernard J. Le Garet Perigneux 42380 / FR | ||
02 /
Quoy, Didier J. 25, rue Varizelle Saint Chamond 42400 / FR | |||
03 /
Hermans, Jacobus P. M. Heile Schoorstraat 64 Tilburg 5018 EG / NL | |||
04 /
van den Broek, Johannes L. L. A. Bijsterveldenlaan 123 Tilburg 5045 ZW / NL | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 02014885.4 | 04.07.2002 | [2003/02] | Priority number, date | US20010303572P | 06.07.2001 Original published format: US 303572 P | [2003/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1273381 | Date: | 08.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1273381 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B23K23/00, H01R4/02, B22D19/04, B23K37/06 | [2003/02] | CPC: |
B23K23/00 (EP,US);
H01R4/02 (EP,US);
B23K2101/36 (EP,US);
B23K2101/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/02] | Title | German: | Schweissvorrichtung und Verfahren zur Herstellung elektrischer Verbindungen | [2003/02] | English: | Welding apparatus and method for forming electrical connections | [2003/02] | French: | Appareil de soudage et procédé pour réaliser des connexions électriques | [2003/02] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 06.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.01.2005 | BE | 05.01.2005 | BG | 05.01.2005 | CH | 05.01.2005 | CZ | 05.01.2005 | EE | 05.01.2005 | FI | 05.01.2005 | IT | 05.01.2005 | LI | 05.01.2005 | SK | 05.01.2005 | TR | 05.01.2005 | DK | 05.04.2005 | GR | 05.04.2005 | SE | 05.04.2005 | ES | 16.04.2005 | PT | 05.06.2005 | CY | 04.07.2005 | IE | 04.07.2005 | LU | 04.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/38] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
BG | 05.01.2005 | ||
CH | 05.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2005 | ||
EE | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
IT | 05.01.2005 | ||
LI | 05.01.2005 | ||
SK | 05.01.2005 | ||
TR | 05.01.2005 | ||
DK | 05.04.2005 | ||
GR | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
CY | 04.07.2005 | ||
IE | 04.07.2005 | ||
LU | 04.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
BG | 05.01.2005 | ||
CH | 05.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2005 | ||
EE | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
LI | 05.01.2005 | ||
SK | 05.01.2005 | ||
TR | 05.01.2005 | ||
DK | 05.04.2005 | ||
GR | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
CY | 04.07.2005 | ||
IE | 04.07.2005 | ||
LU | 04.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
BG | 05.01.2005 | ||
CH | 05.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2005 | ||
EE | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
LI | 05.01.2005 | ||
SK | 05.01.2005 | ||
TR | 05.01.2005 | ||
DK | 05.04.2005 | ||
GR | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
CY | 04.07.2005 | ||
IE | 04.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/10] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
BG | 05.01.2005 | ||
CH | 05.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2005 | ||
EE | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
LI | 05.01.2005 | ||
SK | 05.01.2005 | ||
TR | 05.01.2005 | ||
DK | 05.04.2005 | ||
GR | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
IE | 04.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
BG | 05.01.2005 | ||
CH | 05.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
LI | 05.01.2005 | ||
SK | 05.01.2005 | ||
TR | 05.01.2005 | ||
DK | 05.04.2005 | ||
GR | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
IE | 04.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
BG | 05.01.2005 | ||
CH | 05.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
LI | 05.01.2005 | ||
SK | 05.01.2005 | ||
DK | 05.04.2005 | ||
GR | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
IE | 04.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
BG | 05.01.2005 | ||
CH | 05.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
LI | 05.01.2005 | ||
SK | 05.01.2005 | ||
DK | 05.04.2005 | ||
GR | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
IE | 04.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/15] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
BG | 05.01.2005 | ||
CH | 05.01.2005 | ||
CZ | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
LI | 05.01.2005 | ||
SK | 05.01.2005 | ||
DK | 05.04.2005 | ||
GR | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
BG | 05.01.2005 | ||
CH | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
LI | 05.01.2005 | ||
SK | 05.01.2005 | ||
DK | 05.04.2005 | ||
GR | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
BG | 05.01.2005 | ||
CH | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
LI | 05.01.2005 | ||
SK | 05.01.2005 | ||
DK | 05.04.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
ES | 16.04.2005 | ||
Former [2006/01] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
BG | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
SK | 05.01.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 05.01.2005 | |
BE | 05.01.2005 | ||
BG | 05.01.2005 | ||
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/48] | BG | 05.01.2005 | |
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
SE | 05.04.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | BG | 05.01.2005 | |
FI | 05.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/30] | BG | 05.01.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3113359 (BURKE DONALD J) [A] 1,4,5,10,16 * columns 18-13 * * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 4 * * column 4, line 33 - column 6, line 9; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US3234603 (LEUTHY HENRY R, et al) [A] 1,2,4,5,10,16 * column 1, lines 9-12 * * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 50; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5660317 (SINGER RICHARD E [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * column 4, line 21 - column 7, line 21 * * column 8, line 33 - column 9, line 32; figures 1-7,15-17 *; | [A]EP0870569 (ERICO INT CORP [US]) [A] 6 * column 6, line 46 - column 9, line 30; figures 1-18,22,25 *; | [A]EP0875330 (ERICO INT CORP [US]) [A] 1,10* column 8, line 27 - column 9, line 45; figures 11,12 * |