EP1380741 - Throttle device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.05.2013 [2013/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Car Corporation 405 31 Göteborg / SE | [2011/38] |
Former [2004/03] | For all designated states Ford Global Technologies, Inc. 600 Parklane Towers East Dearborn, Michigan 48126 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mullerström, Oscar Hanö fyrs väg 4A 423 40 Göteborg / SE | [2004/03] | Representative(s) | Spitmann, Knut Hermann Volvo Car Corporation Department 91030 PVD 4:1 405 31 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | Spitmann, Knut Hermann Volvo Car Corporation Department 91030 PVD 4:1 405 31 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2004/03] | Spitmann, Knut Hermann Volvo Car Corporation Department 91030 PVD 4:1 405 31 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 02015439.9 | 11.07.2002 | [2004/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1380741 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1380741 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02D9/10, F16K1/22 | [2004/03] | CPC: |
F16K27/0218 (EP);
F02D9/10 (EP);
F16K1/221 (EP);
F16K1/223 (EP);
F02B31/06 (EP);
F02D9/107 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, SE [2004/41] |
Former [2004/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Drosselklappen-Einrichtung | [2004/03] | English: | Throttle device | [2004/03] | French: | Dispositif d'étranglement | [2004/03] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 11.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.10.2005 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH09151816 ; | [A]US2529572 (RAYBOULD FRANK J) [A] 1-4,8-10 * column 2, line 6 - line 55; figures 1-4 *; | [A]GB1061651 (VILLIERS ENGINEERING CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 64 - line 77; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US4943404 (WALDROP JOE R [US]) [A] 5,6 * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 18; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US5342019 (BRAUN HERMANN [DE], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 5; figure 1 *; | [DA]EP0861977 (KNECHT FILTERWERKE GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1-10* column 1, line 28 - line 36; figures 2,3 *; | [X]US5813380 (TAKAHASHI AKIRA [JP], et al) [X] 1 * column 10, line 10 - line 67; figures 11-18 *; | [DA]US5996549 (MAYER THOMAS E [DE], et al) [DA] 1-10 * column 2, line 53 - line 63; figures 1-3 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, & JP09151816 A 19970610 (NOK CORP) [A] 1,2 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0861977 | US5996549 |