EP1288559 - Optoelectronic monitoring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2008 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICK AG Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | [2007/07] |
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states Sick AG Sebastian-Kneipp-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch, Breisgau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henkel, Olaf Kaiserstuhlstrasse 15 79276 Reute / DE | 02 /
Wüstefeld, Martin Siedlungsweg 14 79350 Sexau / DE | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02015447.2 | 11.07.2002 | [2003/10] | Priority number, date | DE20011042362 | 30.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10142362 | [2003/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1288559 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1288559 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | [2004/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1288559 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16P3/14 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
F16P3/144 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/10] | Title | German: | Optoelektronische Überwachungseinrichtung | [2003/10] | English: | Optoelectronic monitoring device | [2003/10] | French: | Dispositif de surveillance optoélectronique | [2003/10] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 14.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 05.09.2007 | CZ | 05.09.2007 | DK | 05.09.2007 | EE | 05.09.2007 | FI | 05.09.2007 | GB | 05.09.2007 | IE | 05.09.2007 | NL | 05.09.2007 | SK | 05.09.2007 | TR | 05.09.2007 | BG | 05.12.2007 | SE | 05.12.2007 | GR | 06.12.2007 | ES | 16.12.2007 | PT | 06.02.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2009/37] | CY | 05.09.2007 | |
CZ | 05.09.2007 | ||
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
GB | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
BG | 05.12.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/33] | CY | 05.09.2007 | |
CZ | 05.09.2007 | ||
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
GB | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 05.09.2007 | |
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
EE | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
GB | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 05.09.2007 | |
DK | 05.09.2007 | ||
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
GB | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 05.09.2007 | |
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
GB | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
SE | 05.12.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | CZ | 05.09.2007 | |
FI | 05.09.2007 | ||
GB | 05.09.2007 | ||
IE | 05.09.2007 | ||
NL | 05.09.2007 | ||
SK | 05.09.2007 | ||
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
PT | 06.02.2008 | ||
Former [2008/20] | FI | 05.09.2007 | |
GR | 06.12.2007 | ||
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 05.09.2007 | |
ES | 16.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 16.12.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2241556 (MACMILLIN HOWARD F, et al); | [A]DE1170286 (LOTHAR FRANKE); | [A]US4742337 (HAAG GUEENTER [DE]) [A] 1,15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19544632 (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1,15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0897123 (SICK AG [DE]); | [A]DE19938639 (PILZ GMBH & CO [DE]) |