EP1288212 - Process of lactonization in the preparation of statins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CJ CheilJedang Corporation 500, Namdaemunro 5-ga Jung-gu Seoul 100-095 / KR | [2008/34] |
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states Cheil Jedang Corporation 500, Namdae-moon-no5-ga, Chung-ku Seoul 100-095 / KR | ||
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states CHEIL JEDANG Corporation 500, Namdae-moon-no5-ga, Chung-ku Seoul 100-095 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Kwang-Hyeg 702-402 Hwaseongvillage, Mongyeonmaeul, Yatap-dong Bundang-gu, Seongnam Si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Jin-Wan 101-205 Woojung Apt., 46-5, Cheonho 1-dong Gangdong-gu, Seoul / KR | 03 /
Yoon, Myeong-Sik 102-1905 Hanshin Apt., 453-1, Jukjeon-ri Suji-eup, Yongin Si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Choi, Kwang-Do 11-808 Bisan Samho Apt., Bisan 3-dong, Dongan-gu Anyang Si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Lee, Sang-Ho 301-105 Gwanak Seongwon Apt., Buheung-don Dongan-gu, Anyang Si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
Cho, Hong-Suk, Cheil Jedang Technology Pharmac. Res. Inst., San 522-1, Deokpyeong-ri Majang-myeon, Icheon Si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02015509.9 | 10.07.2002 | [2003/10] | Priority number, date | KR20010051796 | 27.08.2001 Original published format: KR 2001051796 | [2003/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1288212 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1288212 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07D309/30 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
C07D309/30 (EP,US);
C07D309/06 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/10] | Title | German: | Laktonisierung im Verfahren zur Herstellung von Statinen | [2003/10] | English: | Process of lactonization in the preparation of statins | [2003/10] | French: | Procédé de lactonisation dans la préparation de statins | [2003/10] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/27] | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.04.2008 | BE | 23.04.2008 | CY | 23.04.2008 | CZ | 23.04.2008 | DK | 23.04.2008 | EE | 23.04.2008 | FI | 23.04.2008 | IT | 23.04.2008 | NL | 23.04.2008 | SK | 23.04.2008 | TR | 23.04.2008 | IE | 10.07.2008 | LU | 10.07.2008 | BG | 23.07.2008 | SE | 23.07.2008 | GR | 24.07.2008 | CH | 31.07.2008 | LI | 31.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | ES | 03.08.2008 | PT | 23.09.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CY | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IT | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
TR | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 10.07.2008 | ||
LU | 10.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/34] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CY | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IT | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 10.07.2008 | ||
LU | 10.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IT | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 10.07.2008 | ||
LU | 10.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
IT | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 10.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
IE | 10.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
CH | 31.07.2008 | ||
LI | 31.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
EE | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/16] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
BE | 23.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2008 | ||
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
SK | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
DK | 23.04.2008 | ||
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
SE | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 23.04.2008 | |
FI | 23.04.2008 | ||
NL | 23.04.2008 | ||
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
PT | 23.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 23.04.2008 | |
BG | 23.07.2008 | ||
ES | 03.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/47] | ES | 03.08.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0299656 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [AD] 1-6 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0351918 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0511867 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [A] 1-6* claim 5 *; | [A]US5393893 (KUBELA RUDOLF [CA], et al) [A] 1-6 * claims 1-3 *; | [AD]US5917058 (KUMAR YATENDRA [IN], et al) [AD] 1-6 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0955297 (RANBAXY LAB LTD [IN]) [A] 1-6 * claim 1 * |