EP1280147 - Information recording and reproducing apparatus having a spindle motor and manufacturing method of spindle motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2003/05] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Noda, Hiromitsu 3-25-6, Taguchiyama Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0001 / JP | 02 /
Obata, Shigeo 2-3-11, Miyamotodori, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, hyogo 651-0063 / JP | [2003/05] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/05] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02015679.0 | 17.07.2002 | [2003/05] | Priority number, date | JP20010216348 | 17.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001216348 | JP20010216349 | 17.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001216349 | JP20010217766 | 18.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001217766 | JP20010217767 | 18.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001217767 | JP20010217769 | 18.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001217769 | [2003/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1280147 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1280147 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | [2004/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G11B19/20, H02K1/00, H02K15/00, F16C17/00, F16C17/10 | [2003/48] | CPC: |
G11B19/2009 (EP,US);
F16C17/107 (EP,US);
F16C33/14 (EP,US);
F16C2220/44 (EP,US);
F16C2220/66 (EP,US);
F16C2223/08 (EP,US);
F16C2370/12 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/05] | G11B19/20, H02K1/00, H02K15/00, F16C17/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/50] |
Former [2003/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Informationsaufzeichnungs- und -wiedergabegerät mit Spindelmotor und Verfahren zur Herstellung des Spindelmotors | [2003/05] | English: | Information recording and reproducing apparatus having a spindle motor and manufacturing method of spindle motor | [2003/05] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement et de reproduction d'informations avec moteur de broche et méthode de fabrication du moteur de broche | [2003/05] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/22] | 06.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/26] | 05.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH1118384 ; | [Y]JPH04111256 ; | [A]JPH07312066 ; | [XAY]EP0392500 (EBARA CORP [JP]) [X] 29-32,51,52 * abstract * * column 4, line 6 - line 25 * * column 5, line 38 - column 7, line 23 * * column 8, line 17 - line 33 * * column 10, line 58 - column 11, line 15 * [A] 1-9,35,36 [Y] 10-14,42,43,45,46; | [X]DE4221429 (PAPST MOTOREN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 29-32,51,52 * the whole document *; | [A]US5536088 (CHEEVER CHARLES J [US], et al) [A] 1-14,35,36,42,43,45,46 * abstract * * column 3, line 51 - line 58; figure - *; | [YA]WO9848188 (SEAGATE TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [Y] 10-14,42,43,45,46 * abstract * * page 9, line 9 - line 13; figure 2 * [A] 1-9,35,36; | [XY]US6172847 (SAKATANI IKUNORI [JP], et al) [X] 15-18,44 * the whole document * [Y] 11,13,43; | [A]WO0118413 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [A] 10-14,29-32,42,43,51,52* the whole document * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990430), vol. 1999, no. 04, & JP11018384 A 19990122 (NIPPON SEIKO KK) [X] 37-41 * abstract * [Y] 1-9,35,36 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920805), vol. 016, no. 361, Database accession no. (P - 1396), & JP04111256 A 19920413 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 1-9,35,36 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960329), vol. 1996, no. 03, & JP07312066 A 19951128 (NEC CORP) [A] 5,39 * abstract * |