EP1277554 - Molding tool and method of fabrication thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2005 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.11.2005 [2005/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Tokai Model 15banchi3, Aza-Shimoda, Oaza-Noba, Kouta-cho Nukata-gun, Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Tokai Model 15banchi3, Aza-Shimoda, Oaza-Noba, Kouta-cho Nukata-gun, Aichi-ken / JP | ||
Former [2003/04] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Tokai Model 15banchi3, Aza-Shimoda, Oaza-Noba, Kouta-cho Nakata-gun, Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Osaki, Tokihito, c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Tokai Model 15banchi3, Aza-Shimoda, Oaza-Noba, Kouta-cho Nukata-gun, Aichi-ken / JP | [2003/04] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/04] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02015779.8 | 15.07.2002 | [2003/04] | Priority number, date | JP20010215283 | 16.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001215283 | JP20020141353 | 16.05.2002 Original published format: JP 2002141353 | [2003/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1277554 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1277554 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B29C33/38, B29C33/56 | [2003/04] | CPC: |
B29C33/565 (EP,US);
B29C45/26 (KR);
B29C33/3842 (EP,US);
B33Y70/00 (EP,KR,US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2003/41] |
Former [2003/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Formwerkzeug und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [2003/04] | English: | Molding tool and method of fabrication thereof | [2003/04] | French: | Outil de moulage et procédé pour sa fabrication | [2003/04] | Examination procedure | 07.04.2003 | Examination requested [2003/23] | 16.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS57157708 ; | [Y]JPS57159610 ; | JPS57157708 [ ]; | [XY] - PARADIS R, "A COMPARISON OF THE CONVENTIONAL MACHINED ALUMINUM AND RAPID EPOXY SHELL PROTOYPE MOLD BUILDING PROCESSES", JOURNAL OF INJECTION MOLDING TECHNOLOGY, SOCIETY OF PLASTICS ENGINEERS, BROOKFIELD, CT, US, (19980301), vol. 2, no. 1, ISSN 1533-905X, pages 8 - 17, XP000740773 [X] 1-4,6-9 * page 11, column 2 - page 13, column 1, paragraph 1 * [Y] 5,10-13 | [AY] - GEBHARDT A, "RAPID TOOLING DER SCHNELLE WEG ZUM SPRITZGIESSWERKZEUG", KUNSTSTOFFE, CARL HANSER VERLAG. MUNCHEN, DE, (199811), vol. 88, no. 11, ISSN 0023-5563, pages 1992 - 1994,1996,1998,2000, XP000906260 [A] 1-3 * page 1993, column 2, paragraph 3 - column 3, paragraph 1 * * page 1994, column 3, paragraph L - page 1996, column 1 * [Y] 5 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821222), vol. 006, no. 263, Database accession no. (M - 181), & JP57157708 A 19820929 (HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KK) [Y] 10 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821225), vol. 006, no. 267, Database accession no. (M - 182), & JP57159610 A 19821001 (HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KK) [Y] 11-13 * abstract * | [ ] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1983, no. 15, Database accession no. 1983-35214k, XP002217418 & JPS57157708 A 00000000 [ ] * abstract * |