EP1359341 - Magnetic spring device with negative stiffness [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Integrated Dynamics Engineering GmbH Karl-Liebknecht-Strasse 30 65479 Raunheim / DE | [2006/06] |
Former [2003/45] | For all designated states Integrated Dynamics Engineering GmbH Karl-Liebknecht-Strasse 30 65479 Raunheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heiland, Peter Karl-Liebknecht-Strasse 30 65479 Raunheim / DE | 02 /
Hartgers, Han Bissopsmolen 6 6512 DS Einhoven / NL | [2006/06] |
Former [2004/09] | 01 /
Heiland, Peter Karl-Liebnecht-Strasse 30 65479 Raunheim / DE | ||
02 /
Hartgers, Han Bissopsmolen 6 6512 DS Einhoven / NL | |||
Former [2003/45] | 01 /
Heiland, Peter Karl-Liebnecht-Strasse 30 65479 Raunheim / DE | Representative(s) | Herden, Andreas F. Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/45] | Herden, Andreas F. Blumbach, Kramer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 02015827.5 | 16.07.2002 | [2003/45] | Priority number, date | DE20021020008 | 03.05.2002 Original published format: DE 10220008 | [2003/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1359341 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1359341 | Date: | 07.07.2004 | [2004/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1359341 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16F6/00 | [2003/45] | CPC: |
F16F6/00 (EP,KR,US);
F16F2228/063 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [2005/13] |
Former [2003/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Magnetische Federeinrichtung mit negativer Steifheit | [2003/45] | English: | Magnetic spring device with negative stiffness | [2003/45] | French: | Dispositif de ressort magnétique à rigidité négative | [2003/45] | Examination procedure | 22.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 19.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.04.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE, SK, TR | 17.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.02.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.02.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2002115742 ; | [X]JP2000346129 ; | [X]FR1302481 (S E D A R E L SA SOC EUROP D A) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [XA]EP0767321 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1-5,7-15,18-21,27-34 * figure 7 * [A] 6,16,17,22-26; | [A]WO9917034 (UNIV DELFT TECH [NL], et al) [A] 1* figures 6-7b * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020805), vol. 2002, no. 08, & JP2002115742 A 20020419 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-34 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010406), vol. 2000, no. 15, & JP2000346129 A 20001212 (TOKIN CORP) [X] 1-6 * abstract * | by applicant | DD28186 | EP0127741 |