EP1317998 - Method and device for the positioning of assembing or working units [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2010/37] |
Former [2003/24] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lahni, Wolfgang Friedhofstrasse 55 73614 Schorndorf / DE | 02 /
Kaesser, Rainer Hauptstrasse 92 71566 Althuette / DE | 03 /
Dieterle, Martin Dorfstrasse 32 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE | 04 /
Noller, Thomas Hinterwestermurr 6 71540 Murrhardt / DE | [2003/24] | Application number, filing date | 02015832.5 | 16.07.2002 | [2003/24] | Priority number, date | DE2001159482 | 04.12.2001 Original published format: DE 10159482 | [2003/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1317998 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1317998 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B25J17/02, B23P19/00, B25J9/16 | [2003/24] | CPC: |
B23P19/107 (EP);
B23P19/12 (EP);
B23Q15/225 (EP);
B25J17/0208 (EP);
G05B2219/49237 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/24] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Positionierung von Füge- oder Bearbeitungseinheiten | [2003/24] | English: | Method and device for the positioning of assembing or working units | [2003/24] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de positionnement d'unités d'assemblage ou de travail | [2003/24] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 01.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.09.2010 | CZ | 15.09.2010 | DK | 15.09.2010 | EE | 15.09.2010 | FI | 15.09.2010 | IE | 15.09.2010 | IT | 15.09.2010 | NL | 15.09.2010 | SE | 15.09.2010 | SK | 15.09.2010 | TR | 15.09.2010 | BG | 15.12.2010 | GR | 16.12.2010 | ES | 26.12.2010 | PT | 17.01.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/42] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.12.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 15.09.2010 | |
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | FI | 15.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4884941 (KAZEROONI HOMAYOON [US]) [A] 1,2,6,8* abstract *; | [YD]DE19830386 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [YD] 1,6 * abstract * * column 6, line 45 - line 53 *; | [Y]DE19849720 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1,6 * abstract * * column 5, line 21 - line 34 * |