EP1284148 - Procedure for platinum coating of titanium cardiac electrodes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2007 | Change: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | 22.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medico S.p.a. Via Zabarella n. 81 35121 Padova / IT | [2003/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Snichelotto, Eugenio Via Zabarella n. 81 35121 Padova / IT | 02 /
Baraldo, Marco Via Zabarella n. 81 35121 Padova / IT | [2003/08] | Representative(s) | Gustorf, Gerhard Bachstrasse 6a 84036 Landshut / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/08] | Gustorf, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Bachstrasse 6 A 84036 Landshut / DE | Application number, filing date | 02015976.0 | 18.07.2002 | [2003/08] | Priority number, date | IT2001PD00199 | 06.08.2001 Original published format: IT PD20010199 | [2003/08] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1284148 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1284148 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | [2003/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05 | [2003/08] | CPC: |
A61N1/056 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/08] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Beschichtung von titanhaltigen Herzelektroden mit Platin | [2003/08] | English: | Procedure for platinum coating of titanium cardiac electrodes | [2003/08] | French: | Procédé de revêtement d'électrodes cardiaques en titane avec du platine | [2003/08] | Examination procedure | 09.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/33] | 29.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/30] | 07.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0043461 (SORIN BIOMEDICA SPA [IT]) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]US5181526 (YAMASAKI HARUKI [JP]) [A] 1-3* the whole document *; | [Y]EP0596589 (TELECTRONICS NV [AN]) [Y] 1-3 * column 3, line 45 - line 58 * * column 4, line 36 - column 5, line 6 * * column 13, lines 3-6 *; | [Y]EP0839553 (HERAEUS GMBH W C [DE]) [Y] 1-3 * columns 1-3; claims 7,16,19 * |