EP1382584 - Aqueous slurries of ground bottom ash from incineration of municipal solid wastes for cement mixes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENCO S.r.l. Via Lazzaris, 7 31027 Spresiano (TV) / IT | [2004/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cassago, Davide c/o Politecno di Milano Dip. Giulio Natta Via Mancinelli, 7 20131 Milano (MI) / IT | 02 /
Carsana, Maddalena c/o Politecno di Milano Dip. Giulio Natta Via Mancinelli, 7 20131 Milano (MI) / IT | 03 /
Bertolini, Luca Via Lazzaris, 7 31027 Spresiano (TV) / IT | 04 /
Colleopardi, Mario Via Lazzaris, 7 31027 Spresiano (TV) / IT | [2004/04] | Representative(s) | Banfi, Paolo Bianchetti & Minoja with Trevisan & Cuonzo IPS Srl Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2004/04] | Banfi, Paolo Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Rossini, 8 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 02016040.4 | 18.07.2002 | [2004/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1382584 | Date: | 21.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C04B18/10, C04B20/02, B03B9/04, B09B3/00 | [2004/04] | CPC: |
C04B18/10 (EP);
B03B9/04 (EP);
B09B3/00 (EP);
C04B28/02 (EP);
Y02W30/91 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B18/10, C04B20/026 (EP);
C04B28/02, C04B18/10, C04B2103/32 (EP) | Designated contracting states | [2004/42] |
Former [2004/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wässrige Schlämme aus gemahlenen Bodenaschen von Stadtmüllverbrennung für Zementmischungen | [2004/04] | English: | Aqueous slurries of ground bottom ash from incineration of municipal solid wastes for cement mixes | [2004/04] | French: | Boues aqueuses de cendres residuelles de l'incineration de déchets municipaux solides pour mélanges cimentaires | [2004/04] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/23] | 29.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2005/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.08.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2004 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2004 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2004 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2004 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 30.08.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.08.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4804147 (HOOPER WILLIAM F [US]) [A] 1,6,11 * claim - *; | [A]GB2272695 (NEEDHAM GROUP LIMITED [GB]) [A] 1 * example - *; | CN1105344 [ ] (LIANYUNGANG CITY INST OF BUILD [CN]); | [A]WO0211960 (ENVIROC INC [US], et al) [A] 1,2,6-9,11 * claim - *; | [E]WO02081398 (PETRACEM SRL [IT], et al) [E] 1-3,6,11 * page 6, line 5 - line 9; claim - *; | [A] - LAMERS F J M ET AL, "UPGRADING TECHNIQUES FOR THE QUALITY IMPROVEMENT OF MUNICIPAL WASTEINCINERATION RESIDUES", ENVIRONMENTAL ASPECTS OF CONSTRUCTION WITH WASTE MATERIALS. MAASTRICHT, JUNE 1 - 3, 1994, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ENVIRONMENTAL IMPLICATIONS OF CONSTRUCTION WITH WASTE MATERIALS. (WASCON), AMSTERDAM, ELSEVIER, NL, (19940601), vol. CONF. 2, pages 645 - 654, XP000480205 [A] 1 * table 1 * | [A] - EPODOC, EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE, THE HAGUE, NL, XP002226357 [A] 1 * abstract * |