EP1279543 - Hybrid drivetrain for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | For all designated states Renault S.A. 13-15 quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92513 Boulogne Billancourt Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states Renault S.A. 13-15 quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92513 Boulogne Billancourt Cedex / FR | |||
Former [2003/05] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states Renault S.A. 13-15 quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92513 Boulogne Billancourt Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oshidari, Toshikazu 5-16-12, Shounantakatori Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Nakano, Masaki 2140-41, Kamiiida-cho, Izumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Kargar, Keyvan 128 avenue de Paris 78000 Versailles / FR | 04 /
Poupon, Joel 22 rue Rouelle 75015 Paris / FR | [2003/10] |
Former [2003/05] | 01 /
Oshidari, Toshikazu 5-16-12, Shounantakatori Yokosuka-shi, Kanagawa / JP | ||
02 /
Nakano, Masaki 2140-41, Kamiiida-cho, Izumi-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP | |||
03 /
Kargar, Keyvan 128 avenue du Paris 78000 Paris / FR | |||
04 /
Poupon, Joel 22 rue Rouelle 75015 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/05] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02016295.4 | 23.07.2002 | [2003/05] | Priority number, date | JP20010221226 | 23.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001221226 | JP20010221222 | 23.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001221222 | [2003/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1279543 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1279543 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | [2003/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1279543 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/04, F16H3/72, H02K57/00 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
B60K6/38 (EP,US);
B60K6/365 (EP,US);
B60K6/40 (EP,US);
B60K6/445 (EP,US);
B60K6/448 (EP,US);
F16H3/728 (EP,US);
H02K51/00 (EP,US);
B60K1/02 (EP,US);
B60K2006/262 (EP,US);
F16H2037/103 (EP,US);
F16H2200/2005 (EP,US);
F16H2200/2007 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/37] |
Former [2003/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hybridantriebsstrang eines Kraftfahrzeugs | [2003/05] | English: | Hybrid drivetrain for a vehicle | [2003/05] | French: | Chaîne motrice hybride pour véhicules | [2003/05] | Examination procedure | 23.07.2002 | Examination requested [2003/05] | 08.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1515321 (AHLM CHARLES E F, et al) [A] 1* abstract *; | [X]DE19606771 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 12,19,20 * abstract *; | [X]FR2781727 (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 19,20 * abstract *; | [XA]DE19841829 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,8-14,19,20 * abstract * [A] 15; | [X]DE19909424 (TENBERGE PETER [DE]) [X] 1-12 * abstract *; | [X]DE19916489 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,8-10 * abstract *; | [X]EP1092583 (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1-4 * abstract *; | [X]EP1106412 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 12 * abstract * * paragraph [0168] * | by applicant | JP2000142146 | JP2001221226 | JP2001221222 |