EP1279831 - Variable displacement compressor and displacement control valve for variable displacement compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TGK CO., Ltd. 1211-4 Kunugidacho, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 193-0942 / JP | [2008/29] |
Former [2003/05] | For all designated states TGK CO., Ltd. 1211-4 Kunugidacho, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 193-0942 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirota, Hisatoshi c/o TGK Co., Ltd., 1211-4, Kunugida-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 193-0942 / JP | 02 /
Nakazawa, Tomokazu c/o TGK Co., Ltd., 1211-4, Kunugida-cho Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 193-0942 / JP | [2003/05] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/05] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02016310.1 | 24.07.2002 | [2003/05] | Priority number, date | JP20010224209 | 25.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001224209 | [2003/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1279831 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1279831 | Date: | 01.12.2004 | [2004/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1279831 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F04B27/18 | [2003/05] | CPC: |
F04B27/1804 (EP,US);
F04B2027/1827 (EP,US);
F04B2027/1831 (EP,US);
F04B2027/1854 (EP,US);
F25B2309/061 (EP,US);
F25B9/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/34] |
Former [2003/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hubregelungsventil zur Verwendung in einem Kompressor mit veränderlicher Fördermenge | [2003/05] | English: | Variable displacement compressor and displacement control valve for variable displacement compressor | [2003/05] | French: | Soupape de contrôle de déplacement utilisée dans un compresseur à capacité variable | [2003/05] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/05] | 02.06.2005 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.09.2005 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | 13.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 07.07.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 07.07.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 16.07.2008 | GB | 16.10.2008 | [2010/01] |
Former [2009/39] | IT | 16.07.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6010312 (SUITOU KEN [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 22 *; | [X]EP1033489 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]) [X] 1,7* paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] *; | [X]EP1081378 (TOYODA AUTOMATIC LOOM WORKS [JP]) [X] 1-22 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * |