EP1261026 - Device having resin package and method of producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.09.2003 [2003/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoneda, Yoshiyuki, Fujitsu Limited 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
Tsuji, Kazuto, Fujitsu Limited 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
Orimo, Seiichi, Fujitsu Limited 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
Sakoda, Hideharu, Fujitsu Limited 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 05 /
Nomoto, Ryuji, Fujitsu Limited 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 06 /
Onodera, Masanori, Fujitsu Limited 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 07 /
Kasai, Junichi, Fujitsu Limited 1-1 Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2002/48] | Representative(s) | Mohun, Stephen John Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/48] | Mohun, Stephen John Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 02016355.6 | 07.11.1996 | [2002/48] | Priority number, date | JP19950290135 | 08.11.1995 Original published format: JP 29013595 | JP19950322803 | 12.12.1995 Original published format: JP 32280395 | JP19960183838 | 12.07.1996 Original published format: JP 18383896 | JP19960250707 | 20.09.1996 Original published format: JP 25070796 | JP19960267607 | 08.10.1996 Original published format: JP 26760796 | [2002/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1261026 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/31, H01L21/68 | [2002/48] | CPC: |
H01L21/4832 (EP,US);
H01L23/48 (KR);
H01L21/561 (EP,US);
H01L21/565 (EP,US);
H01L21/568 (EP,US);
H01L21/67138 (EP,US);
H01L21/6833 (EP,US);
H01L23/3107 (EP,US);
H01L24/11 (EP,US);
H01L24/13 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L24/85 (EP,US);
H01L24/97 (EP,US);
H01L25/105 (EP,US);
H05K3/305 (EP,US);
H05K3/3442 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05554 (EP,US);
H01L2224/11 (EP,US);
H01L2224/1134 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13099 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45015 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45565 (EP,US);
H01L2224/4569 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48228 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48464 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48465 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48471 (EP,US);
H01L2224/4848 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48599 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49171 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L2224/78301 (EP,US);
H01L2224/7865 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85001 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85051 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85181 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85205 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85439 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85444 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85455 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85664 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85986 (EP,US);
H01L2224/92 (EP,US);
H01L2224/92247 (EP,US);
H01L2224/97 (EP,US);
H01L2225/1035 (EP,US);
H01L2225/107 (EP,US);
H01L2225/1094 (EP,US);
H01L24/45 (EP,US);
H01L24/49 (EP,US);
H01L24/78 (EP,US);
H01L29/0657 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01013 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01028 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01047 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0105 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/10158 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1815 (EP,US);
H01L2924/18161 (EP,US);
H01L2924/18165 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3011 (EP,US);
H05K1/181 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09045 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10727 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10977 (EP,US);
H05K3/303 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/11, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/13099, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/13, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48247, H01L2224/48471, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48227 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49171, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/49171, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/49171, H01L2224/48465, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/49171, H01L2224/48471, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/78301, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85181, H01L2224/48465, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85205, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/85986, H01L2224/85051, H01L2224/85181 (US,EP);
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/73265 (US,EP);
H01L2224/97, H01L2924/15311 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00013, H01L2224/13099 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/48] | Title | German: | Anordnung bestehend aus einer Harzpackung und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2002/48] | English: | Device having resin package and method of producing the same | [2002/48] | French: | Dispositif comprenant un empaquetage en résine et procédé de fabrication | [2002/48] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/29] | 22.07.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/38] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96308093.2 / EP0773584 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19960308093) is 10.01.2002 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS61135131 ; | [X]JPH02112264 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861108), vol. 010, no. 329, Database accession no. (E - 452), & JP61135131 A 19860623 (NEC CORP) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900719), vol. 014, no. 336, Database accession no. (E - 0953), & JP02112264 A 19900424 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-3 * the whole document * |