EP1288884 - System and method of integrating subscriber based traffic navigation and lodging data with GPS data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fish, Robert 83 Cottage Place Gilette, New Jersey 07933 / US | 02 /
Johnson, Stephen 808 Longfield Road Erdenheim, Pennsylvania 19038 / US | 03 /
Chang, Chieh-Chung 1702 Pheasant Run Monmouth Junction New Jersey 08852 / US | 04 /
Bushmitch, Dennis 183 Matlook Place Somerset, New Jersey 08873 / US | 05 /
Braun, David Alan 2 Mabor Drive Denville, New Jersey 07834 / US | 06 /
Rahman, Mahfuzur 4507 Twin Oaks Court South Brunswick, New Jersey 08852 / US | 07 /
Li, Luyang 601 Park Street, Apartment 1M Bordentown, New Jersey 08505 / US | [2006/23] |
Former [2003/10] | 01 /
Fish, Robert 83 Cottage Place Gilette, New Jersey 07933 / US | ||
02 /
Johnson, Stephen 808 Longfield Road Erdenheim, Pennsylvania 19038 / US | |||
03 /
Chang, Chieh-Chung 1702 Phesant Run Monmouth Junction New Jersey 08852 / US | |||
04 /
Bushmitch, Dennis 183 Matlook Place Somerset, New Jersey 08873 / US | |||
05 /
Braun, David Alan 2 Mabor Drive Denville, New Jersey 07834 / US | |||
06 /
Rahman, Mahfuzur 4507 Twin Oaks Court South Brunswick, New Jersey 08852 / US | |||
07 /
Li, Luyang 601 Park Street, Apartment 1M Bordentown, New Jersey 08505 / US | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/10] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02016391.1 | 26.07.2002 | [2003/10] | Priority number, date | US20010934927 | 22.08.2001 Original published format: US 934927 | [2003/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1288884 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1288884 | Date: | 10.12.2003 | [2003/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1288884 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/0962, G08G1/0968 | [2003/50] | CPC: |
G08G1/096827 (EP,US);
G08G1/0962 (EP,US);
G08G1/096844 (EP,US);
G08G1/096872 (EP,US);
G08G1/096894 (EP,US);
G01S19/13 (EP,US);
G01S19/42 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2003/10] | G08G1/0962 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/10] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Integration von teilnehmerbasierten Navigationsdaten und Unterkunftsdaten mit GPS-Daten | [2003/10] | English: | System and method of integrating subscriber based traffic navigation and lodging data with GPS data | [2003/10] | French: | Système et procédé pour intégrer des données de navigation basées sur l'abonné et des données de logement avec des données GPS | [2003/10] | Examination procedure | 20.04.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 12.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.06.2006 | BE | 14.06.2006 | CH | 14.06.2006 | CY | 14.06.2006 | CZ | 14.06.2006 | EE | 14.06.2006 | FI | 14.06.2006 | LI | 14.06.2006 | NL | 14.06.2006 | SK | 14.06.2006 | TR | 14.06.2006 | IE | 26.07.2006 | LU | 26.07.2006 | MC | 31.07.2006 | BG | 14.09.2006 | DK | 14.09.2006 | SE | 14.09.2006 | GR | 15.09.2006 | PT | 14.11.2006 | [2009/03] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2006 | ||
EE | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
TR | 14.06.2006 | ||
IE | 26.07.2006 | ||
LU | 26.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
BG | 14.09.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
GR | 15.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2006 | ||
EE | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
IE | 26.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
BG | 14.09.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
GR | 15.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2006 | ||
EE | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
IE | 26.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
GR | 15.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
IE | 26.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
GR | 15.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
IE | 26.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
IE | 26.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/25] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
IE | 26.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/13] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
BE | 14.06.2006 | ||
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/11] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
CH | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
LI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/52] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SE | 14.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/48] | SE | 14.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5948040 (DELORME DAVID M [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 14, lines 62-65 * * column 77, lines 24-33 * * column 78, lines 11-21 * * figure 9B *; | [X]WO0120926 (NEOPOINT INC [US]) [X] 1-7,11-13,15-17 * page 6, lines 22-24 * * page 8, lines 16-19 ** page 10, lines 10-24 *; | [X]WO0128270 (SAKARYA TASKIN [DE]) [X] 1-18 * page 2, lines 10-13 * * page 6, line 26 - page 7, line 1 * * page 10, lines 25,26 * * page 11, lines 15-23 * * page 15, lines 22-28 * * page 16, lines 19-24 * * page 17, lines 21-25 * |