EP1286424 - Electrical connector with overmolded and snap locked pieces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FCI 53, rue de Châteaudun 75311 Paris Cedex 9 / FR | [2003/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wagner, Douglas L. 472 Delwood Ct. Newbury Park, CA 91320 / US | [2003/09] | Representative(s) | Regi, François-Xavier, et al FCI Département Propriété Industrielle 145/147, rue Yves Le Coz 78035 Versailles / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Regi, François-Xavier, et al FCI Département Propriété Industrielle 145/147, rue Yves Le Coz 78035 Versailles / FR | ||
Former [2008/30] | Regi, François-Xavier, et al FCI Intellectual Property Manager 145-147 rue Yves Le Coz 78035 Versailles Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/10] | van Looijengoed, Ferry Antoin Theodorus, et al De Vries & Metman Overschiestraat 180 1062 XK Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2003/09] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02016910.8 | 31.07.2002 | [2003/09] | Priority number, date | US20010923938 | 07.08.2001 Original published format: US 923938 | [2003/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1286424 | Date: | 26.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/09] | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/506, H01R43/24 | [2003/09] | CPC: |
H01R13/405 (EP,US);
H01R43/24 (EP,US);
H01R13/5845 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektrischer Verbinder mit umgossenen und eingerasteten Teilen | [2003/09] | English: | Electrical connector with overmolded and snap locked pieces | [2003/09] | French: | Connecteur électrique ayant des pièces surmoulées et encliquetées | [2003/09] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/32] | 09.06.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |