EP1260347 - Process for producing a molded article made of fibre-reinforced thermoplastic material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | ||
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kitayama, Takeo 75 Brown Rd. Scarsdale 10583 NY / US | 02 /
Matsubara, Shigeyoshi 1-7-3,Zuiko, Higashiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | [2003/10] |
Former [2002/51] | 01 /
Kitayama, Takeo 1-9-1-111, Tamagawa Takatsuki-shi, Osaka / JP | ||
02 /
Matsubara, Shigeyoshi 1-7-3,Zuiko, Higashiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/48] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02016912.4 | 13.07.1998 | [2002/48] | Priority number, date | JP19970189504 | 15.07.1997 Original published format: JP 18950497 | [2002/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1260347 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1260347 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B29C47/10, B29C45/00 | [2004/10] | CPC: |
B29C45/1816 (EP,KR,US);
B29B7/905 (EP,KR,US);
B29B7/421 (EP,KR,US);
B29B7/60 (KR,US);
B29B7/603 (EP);
B29C45/0005 (EP,KR,US);
B29C48/04 (EP,US);
B29C48/288 (EP,US);
B29C48/2886 (EP,US);
B29K2105/06 (EP,KR,US);
B29K2105/16 (EP,KR,US);
B29K2707/04 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2002/48] | B29C47/10, B29C70/12, // B29K101:12 | Designated contracting states | DE [2002/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines geformten Gegenstandes aus faserverstärktem thermoplastishem Harz | [2002/48] | English: | Process for producing a molded article made of fibre-reinforced thermoplastic material | [2002/48] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication d'un objet moulé en résine thermoplastique renforcée de fibres | [2002/48] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 08.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 11.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/31] | 17.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/31] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98113367.1 / EP0893228 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1530229 (DOW CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1 * page 1, column 2, line 28 - page 2, column 2, line 15; figure 1 * * page 3, column 1, line 15 - line 17 *; | [X]EP0639446 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1 * claim 1 ** page 2, line 23 - line 26 *; | [X]EP0706873 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1 * claims 40,41 * * page 5, line 12 - line 16 * * page 10, line 29 - line 40 *; | [X]DE19548854 (EBERS & MUELLER FIBRIT [DE]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 43 - line 53 * |