EP1281945 - Indicating device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2004 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.06.2004 [2004/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schang Michael Hautpstrasse 11 73566 Bartholomae / DE | [2003/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2003/06] | Application number, filing date | 02017120.3 | 30.07.2002 | [2003/06] | Priority number, date | DE2001212862U | 02.08.2001 Original published format: DE 20112862 U | [2003/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1281945 | Date: | 05.02.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G01K11/06 | [2003/06] | CPC: |
G09F3/0291 (EP);
B65D79/02 (EP);
G01K11/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2003/43] |
Former [2003/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung | [2003/06] | English: | Indicating device | [2003/06] | French: | Dispositif indicateur | [2003/06] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/27] | 19.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2004/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.09.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2003 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2003 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2003 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2003 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2003 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2003 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2003 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 15.09.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 15.09.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2621688 (PAILLE CLAUDE [FR]) [X] 1-5,8,10 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2779521 (COSTANZA FREDERIC [FR]) [X] 1-6,8-10* the whole document * |