EP1304859 - Terminal apparatus and method for radio communication [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.2006 [2006/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsuchiya, Daijiro K.K. Toshiba, Intell. Prop. Div. 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2003/17] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/17] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02017232.6 | 31.07.2002 | [2003/17] | Priority number, date | JP20010318221 | 16.10.2001 Original published format: JP 2001318221 | [2003/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1304859 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1304859 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | [2004/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00 | [2003/17] | CPC: |
H04N1/00127 (EP,US);
H04M1/72457 (EP,US);
H04N1/00323 (EP,US);
H04N1/00204 (EP,US);
H04N1/00281 (EP,US);
H04N1/00307 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/06] |
Former [2003/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Terminalvorrichtung und Vorrichtung zur Radiokommunikation | [2003/17] | English: | Terminal apparatus and method for radio communication | [2003/17] | French: | Dispositif de terminal et procédé de radiocommunication | [2003/17] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2002 | Examination requested [2003/17] | 10.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/18] | 28.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5726660 (PURDY PETER K [US], et al) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * figure 2 * * figure 3 *[A] 2-4,6-17; | [X]WO0072577 (PASCAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-17 * abstract * * figure 1 * |