EP1386809 - Master cylinder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2005 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.2005 [2005/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Sachs AG Ernst-Sachs-Strasse 62 97424 Schweinfurt / DE | [2004/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gemeinhardt, André Obere Warte 10 97508 Obereuerheim / DE | 02 /
Koberstein, Ralf Fronstrasse 13 97797 Völkersleier / DE | 03 /
Reuter, Klaus Hüllweg 3 97723 Oberthulba / DE | 04 /
Krappmann, Klaus Uhlandstrasse 57 97469 Gochsheim / DE | [2004/06] | Application number, filing date | 02017259.9 | 01.08.2002 | [2004/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1386809 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1386809 | Date: | 06.10.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60T11/18 | [2004/06] | CPC: |
B60T11/18 (EP,US);
F16D25/08 (EP);
F16D2025/081 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/41] |
Former [2004/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Geberzylinder | [2004/06] | English: | Master cylinder | [2004/06] | French: | Maître-cylindre | [2004/06] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2003 | Examination requested [2004/06] | 29.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB407148 (ERIC CRISP LEWIS, et al) [X] 1,2 * page 3, line 4 - line 62; figure - *; | [A]US4650363 (KEHL GEORG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 11; figure . *; | [A]US5163773 (DENNEY OMER C [US], et al) [A] 3* column 7, line 3 - line 41; figure 1 *; | [X]US5794512 (PROSCH GERHARD [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 5, line 32 - line 47; figure 3 * |