EP1283641 - Ethernet switch module and system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.04.2006 [2006/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2003/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Linares, Ignacio A 1620 Brazos Trail Plano, Texas 75075 / US | 02 /
McKinley, James C. 5902 Norfolk Frisco, Texas 75035 / US | 03 /
Chin, Teck Q. 111 Greencove Lane Richardson, Texas 75081 / US | 04 /
Harkin, Dennis J. 921 Clinton Drive Plano, Texas 75075 / US | [2003/07] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/07] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 02017351.4 | 02.08.2002 | [2003/07] | Priority number, date | US20010928186 | 10.08.2001 Original published format: US 928186 | [2003/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1283641 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1283641 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | [2005/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q1/10, H04L12/56, H05K7/14 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
H04Q1/10 (EP,US);
H04Q1/023 (EP,US);
H04Q1/09 (EP,US);
H05K7/1421 (EP,US);
H04L2012/445 (EP,US);
H04Q2201/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2003/07] | H04Q1/10, H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2005/40] |
Former [2003/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ethernetvermittlungsmodul und System | [2003/07] | English: | Ethernet switch module and system | [2003/07] | French: | Module et système de commutateur Ethernet | [2003/07] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/15] | 10.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2006/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.08.2005 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.08.2005 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 25.08.2005 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0049517 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,12,17 * page 3, line 30 - line 36 *; | [A]US4840568 (BURROUGHS DENNIS M [US], et al); | [X]US5602723 (TAKAHASHI TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [X] 1,12,17 * figure 8 *; | [A]WO9856223 (T R T LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES [FR], et al); | [X]EP0987905 (THOMAS & BETTS INT [US]) [X] 1,2,4,12,13,17,19,20 * paragraph [0029]; figures 1,6 * |