EP1291804 - PCMCIA card with smart card reader [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FCI 53, rue de Châteaudun 75009 Paris / FR | [2003/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Camacho, Gabriel 5 rue du Château 57310 Guenange / FR | [2003/11] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02017638.4 | 06.08.2002 | [2003/11] | Priority number, date | FR20010010673 | 07.08.2001 Original published format: FR 0110673 | [2003/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1291804 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/00 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
G06K7/0034 (EP);
G06K19/07741 (EP);
G06K7/0021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/11] | Title | German: | PCMCIA-Karte mit Smartkartenleser | [2003/11] | English: | PCMCIA card with smart card reader | [2003/11] | French: | Carte PCMCIA avec lecteur de carte à puce | [2003/11] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/37] | 02.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/28] | 19.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5272319 (REY JEAN-YVES [FR]) [Y] 9 * figure 1 *; | [Y]US5679007 (POTDEVIN JEAN MARC [FR], et al) [Y] 4-8 * column 5, line 31 - line 35; figure 2A *; | [A]FR2774193 (SCM SCHNEIDER MICROSYSTEME MIC [FR]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [DXY]US6015092 (POSTLEWAITE WILLIAM M [US], et al) [DX] 1-3,5 * column 4, line 16 - line 26; figures 1,5 * [Y] 4-9 |