EP1284358 - Internal combustion engine fuel injector and its manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2017 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino, 50 10043 Orbassano (TO) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/27] | For all designated states C.R.F. SOCIETA' CONSORTILE PER AZIONI Strada Torino, 50 10043 Orbassano (TO) / IT | ||
Former [2003/08] | For all designated states C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino, 50 10043 Orbassano (TO) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ricco, Mario Via Bari, 6 - Parco dei Principi, Lotto 39 70010 Casamassima / IT | [2003/08] | Representative(s) | Franzolin, Luigi, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/08] | Franzolin, Luigi, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 02017865.3 | 08.08.2002 | [2003/08] | Priority number, date | IT2001TO00814 | 14.08.2001 Original published format: IT TO20010814 | [2003/08] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1284358 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1284358 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | [2003/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1284358 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02M47/02 | [2003/08] | CPC: |
F02M47/027 (EP,US);
F02M2547/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/08] | Title | German: | Verbrennungsmotorskraftstoffeinspritzventil und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [2003/08] | English: | Internal combustion engine fuel injector and its manufacturing method | [2003/08] | French: | Injecteur de combustible pour moteur à combustion interne et son procédé de fabrication | [2003/08] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2004 | Examination requested [2004/29] | 25.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.07.2007 | BE | 04.07.2007 | CH | 04.07.2007 | CY | 04.07.2007 | CZ | 04.07.2007 | DK | 04.07.2007 | EE | 04.07.2007 | FI | 04.07.2007 | LI | 04.07.2007 | NL | 04.07.2007 | SK | 04.07.2007 | TR | 04.07.2007 | IE | 08.08.2007 | LU | 08.08.2007 | MC | 31.08.2007 | BG | 04.10.2007 | GB | 04.10.2007 | SE | 04.10.2007 | GR | 05.10.2007 | ES | 15.10.2007 | PT | 04.12.2007 | [2017/37] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CY | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
EE | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
TR | 04.07.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
LU | 08.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GB | 04.10.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/42] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CY | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
EE | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
TR | 04.07.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
IT | 08.08.2007 | ||
LU | 08.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GB | 04.10.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CY | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
EE | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
IT | 08.08.2007 | ||
LU | 08.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GB | 04.10.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/37] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CY | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
EE | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
LU | 08.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GB | 04.10.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/33] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CY | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
EE | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GB | 04.10.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
EE | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GB | 04.10.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/03] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GB | 04.10.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
IE | 08.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
SE | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
SK | 04.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
DK | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
BE | 04.07.2007 | ||
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
GR | 05.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 04.07.2007 | |
CH | 04.07.2007 | ||
FI | 04.07.2007 | ||
LI | 04.07.2007 | ||
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/10] | FI | 04.07.2007 | |
NL | 04.07.2007 | ||
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
PT | 04.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | NL | 04.07.2007 | |
BG | 04.10.2007 | ||
ES | 15.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | ES | 15.10.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3610529 (HUBER ROBERT) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 15 - line 43; figure 2 *; | [A]EP0385399 (WEBER SRL [IT]) [A] 1-3,9,10,15,17 * column 3, line 3 - line 46; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0450532 (WEBER SRL [IT]) [A] 1,2,4,5,11,16,17 * column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 30; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0916842 (ELASIS SISTEMA RICERCA FIAT [IT]) [A] 1-4,15* paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0016]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE19849933 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,13-15 * column 3, line 1 - line 51; figure 1 * |