EP1287804 - Device for bringing components together in sterile conditions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CSL Behring GmbH Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76 35041 Marburg / DE | [2007/12] |
Former [2004/35] | For all designated states ZLB Behring GmbH Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76 35041 Marburg / DE | ||
Former [2003/10] | For all designated states Aventis Behring GmbH Postfach 1230 35002 Marburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pfeifer, Thomas Auf der Ruetsche 20 35713 Eschenberg / DE | 02 /
Palm, Dietmar Kreuzackerweg 12 35288 Wohratal / DE | 03 /
Becker, Michael Weiherstrasse 19 35232 Dautphetal-Holzhausen / DE | 04 /
Seipp, Michael Wolkersdorfer Strasse 39 35099 Burgwald-Bottendorf / DE | 05 /
Wabnegg, Rainer Zwischen den Dörfern 6 35083 Wetter-Amoenau / DE | [2003/10] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/05] | Application number, filing date | 02017985.9 | 10.08.2002 | [2003/10] | Priority number, date | DE2001142450 | 31.08.2001 Original published format: DE 10142450 | [2003/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1287804 | Date: | 05.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1287804 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | [2003/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1287804 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/20 | [2003/10] | CPC: |
A61J1/2089 (EP,US);
A61J1/20 (KR);
A61J1/201 (EP,US);
A61J1/2013 (EP,US);
A61J1/2055 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/10] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Zusammenführen von Komponenten unter sterilen Bedingungen | [2003/10] | English: | Device for bringing components together in sterile conditions | [2003/10] | French: | Dispositif pour mettre ensemble des composants dans des conditions stériles | [2003/10] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/27] | 16.12.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 15.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2004 | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.02.2012 | CZ | 01.02.2012 | EE | 01.02.2012 | SK | 01.02.2012 | BG | 01.05.2012 | PT | 01.06.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | [2013/33] |
Former [2013/16] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 01.02.2012 | |
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | PT | 01.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4898209 (ZDEB BRIAN D [US]) [X] 1-3,10,13 * column 3, lines 22-37 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 15 *; | [XA]EP0614653 (SUNTORY LTD [JP], et al) [X] 4,5 * paragraph [0015] * * figures 1,4,5 * [A] 6; | [A]US5879345 (ANEAS ANTOINE [FR]) [A] 8,9 * column 5, lines 6-11 ** figure 1 * | Examination | US6022339 | by applicant | EP0737467 |