EP1284184 - Image forming method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, FR | published on 14.01.2009 [2009/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP | ||
Former [2003/08] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Adachi, Keiichi Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd., 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho, Haibara-gun, Shizuoka / JP | [2003/08] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/08] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 02018163.2 | 19.08.2002 | [2003/08] | Priority number, date | JP20010248075 | 17.08.2001 Original published format: JP 2001248075 | JP20010270421 | 06.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001270421 | JP20010270422 | 06.09.2001 Original published format: JP 2001270422 | [2003/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1284184 | Date: | 19.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1284184 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | [2004/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1284184 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B41C1/10 | [2004/12] | CPC: |
B41C1/1066 (EP,US);
B41M7/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2003/08] | B41C1/10, B41M5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2003/08] | Title | German: | Bildaufzeichnungsverfahren und Vorrichtung | [2003/08] | English: | Image forming method and apparatus | [2003/08] | French: | Méthode pour l'enregistrement d'images et dispositif | [2003/08] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/38] | 01.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2006 | BE | 26.07.2006 | CH | 26.07.2006 | CY | 26.07.2006 | CZ | 26.07.2006 | EE | 26.07.2006 | FI | 26.07.2006 | FR | 26.07.2006 | IT | 26.07.2006 | LI | 26.07.2006 | NL | 26.07.2006 | SK | 26.07.2006 | TR | 26.07.2006 | LU | 19.08.2006 | IE | 21.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | BG | 26.10.2006 | DK | 26.10.2006 | SE | 26.10.2006 | GR | 27.10.2006 | ES | 06.11.2006 | PT | 26.12.2006 | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/37] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
EE | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
TR | 26.07.2006 | ||
LU | 19.08.2006 | ||
IE | 21.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
EE | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 21.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/20] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 21.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
GR | 27.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/42] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
IE | 21.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/38] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
IT | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
BE | 26.07.2006 | ||
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
SK | 26.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 26.07.2006 | |
CH | 26.07.2006 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 26.07.2006 | |
CZ | 26.07.2006 | ||
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
DK | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | CH | 26.07.2006 | |
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
NL | 26.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/12] | CH | 26.07.2006 | |
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
BG | 26.10.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | ||
ES | 06.11.2006 | ||
PT | 26.12.2006 | ||
Former [2007/10] | CH | 26.07.2006 | |
FI | 26.07.2006 | ||
LI | 26.07.2006 | ||
SE | 26.10.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0988968 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-12 * figure 1; claims 1,3,4 * * page 2, line 5 - line 8 * * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 39 ** page 5, line 11 - line 16 *; | [X]GB2351699 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-12 * figure 1; claims 1,3,14 * * page 1, line 4 - line 9 * * page 5, line 1 - line 5 * * page 6, line 5 - line 8 * * page 9, line 1 - page 11, line 13 * * page 10, line 24 - page 11, line 1 * | by applicant | GB893429 | GB1122397 | US3900412 | JPS60179751 | US4606989 | JPH0213965 | WO9311866 | JPH10286393 |